Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2703597

EP2703597 - Method of calibration for the use in a process of determining the content of a plurality of compounds contained in a drilling fluid [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.09.2018  [2018/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Geoservices Equipements
127, avenue du Bois de la Pie Paris Nord II
95700 Roissy en France / FR
[2014/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Guerriero, Nicolas
c/o Geoservices
127, avenue du Bois de la Pie Paris Nord II
BP 67049
95971 Roissy en France / FR
02 / Lessi, Jacques
c/o Geoservices
127, avenue du Bois de la Pie Paris Nord II
BP 67049
95971 Roissy en France / FR
 [2014/10]
Representative(s)Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department
Parkstraat 83
2514 JG Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/10]Rzaniak, Martin
Schlumberger
1, rue Henri Becquerel
B.P. 202
92142 Clamart / FR
Application number, filing date12306047.703.09.2012
[2014/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2703597
Date:05.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:E21B21/06, G01N33/28
[2014/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Kalibrierung zur Verwendung in einem Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Inhalts einer Vielzahl von Verbindungen in einer Bohrflüssigkeit[2014/10]
English:Method of calibration for the use in a process of determining the content of a plurality of compounds contained in a drilling fluid[2014/10]
French:Procédé d'étalonnage destiné à être utilisé dans un procédé de détermination d'un contenu constitué de plusieurs composés dans un fluide de forage[2014/10]
Examination procedure03.09.2012Examination requested  [2014/10]
06.12.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/37]
03.05.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US2011303463  (LESSI JACQUES [FR]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0003] , [0019] , [0047] - [0049]; figure 2 * [A] 8,9 [Y] 10-16;
 [XY]US2006224333  (FRECHIN NICOLAS [FR], et al) [X] 1-9 * figures 2-5 * [Y] 10-16;
 [Y]US5161409  (HUGHES TREVOR [GB], et al) [Y] 10-16 * column 12 - paragraph calibration; figures 3-7 *;
 [A]US6443001  (DURIEZ GILBERT [FR], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4635735  (CROWNOVER DONALD J [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
by applicantFR2799790
 EP1710575
 EP2380017
 EP1887343
    - HOFFMAN ET AL., "Equilibrium Constants for a Gas Condensate System", TRANS. AIME, (1953), vol. 198, pages 1 - 10, XP009121842
    - STANDING, "A set of Equations for Computing Equilibrium Ratios of a Crude Oil/Natural Gas System at Pressures below 1,000 psia", SPE, (1979), page 7903