Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2746707

EP2746707 - Method and apparatus for reliquefying natural gas [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CH, LI
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cryostar SAS
2 Rue de l'Industrie, ZI BP 48
68220 Hesingue / FR
[2014/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Fuchs, Vincent
12 rue de Huningue
68870 Bartenheim / FR
02 / Ragot, Mathias
6 rue Sainte Marie
68510 Sierentz / FR
 [2014/26]
Representative(s)Christie, Gemma Louise
The Linde Group
Intellectual Property
10 Priestley Road The Surrey Research Park
Guildford, Surrey GU2 7XY / GB
[2017/20]
Former [2014/26]Hartmann, Jean-Luc
Cabinet Morelle et Bardou
SC Parc technologique du Canal
9 avenue de l'Europe, BP 72253
31520 Ramonville Saint-Agne / FR
Application number, filing date12352005.820.12.2012
[2014/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2746707
Date:25.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2746707
Date:17.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:F25J1/00, F25J1/02, F17C9/04
[2014/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/20]
Former [2014/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Wiederverflüssigung von Erdgas[2014/26]
English:Method and apparatus for reliquefying natural gas[2014/26]
French:Procédé et appareil de reliquéfaction de gaz naturel[2014/26]
Examination procedure16.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
23.10.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.02.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.09.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2017Fee for grant paid
05.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2015
Opposition(s)20.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
GB20.12.2017
IE20.12.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/50]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
GB20.12.2017
IE20.12.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
Former [2018/45]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
IE20.12.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
LU20.12.2017
MT20.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
IT17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT17.05.2017
DK17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
NL17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2959020  (HELMUT KNAPP) [X] 1-3,5-9 * column 2, line 32 - line 41; figure 2 * [Y] 4,5,9,10;
 [XY]EP1813889  (MAEKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1-3,6-8 * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0052]; figure 4 * [Y] 4,5,9,10;
 [XY]US4054433  (BUFFIERE JEAN-PIERRE, et al) [X] 1,7 * column 13, line 28 - line 33; figure 2 * [Y] 4,5,9,10;
 [Y]US2011056238  (MAK JOHN [US]) [Y] 4,10 * paragraph [0024]; figure 3 *;
 [Y]WO2005047761  (HAMWORTHY KSE GAS SYSTEMS AS [NO], et al) [Y] 5,9 * page 1, line 7 - line 9 *
by applicantUS2007256450
 US2009158773
 US2009158774