blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2529720 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2529720



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 154
24.05.2012 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 13
24.05.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8
24.05.2012 Drawings filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 1
14.06.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
18.06.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.06.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
04.07.2012 Priority document Search / examination 15
04.07.2012 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
04.07.2012 General authorisation Search / examination 1
05.07.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.07.2012 Drawings Search / examination 1
05.07.2012 Description Search / examination 9
05.07.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
05.07.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
20.07.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.07.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
13.09.2012 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
13.09.2012 General authorisation Search / examination 1
13.09.2012 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 1
25.10.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
31.10.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
31.10.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 2
31.10.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.11.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
10.12.2012 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.05.2013 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
31.05.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
31.05.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
31.05.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
31.05.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
31.05.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
20.06.2013 Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) Search / examination 1
16.08.2013 Reply to invitation to file a copy of priority search results Search / examination 1
16.08.2013 Priority search results Search / examination 5
14.05.2014 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
07.10.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
14.11.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 12
14.11.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.11.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.11.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.03.2015 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
13.03.2015 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
13.03.2015 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
13.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.03.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
25.03.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
23.04.2015 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
24.04.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
24.04.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.04.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.05.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
18.05.2015 Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney Search / examination 3
11.06.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.06.2015 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
08.07.2015 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
24.07.2015 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
03.08.2015 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
06.08.2015 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 4
13.05.2016 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1