blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2529720


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
29.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.08.2018  [2018/31]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
05.08.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.09.2016  [2016/36]
13.05.2016 No opposition filed within time limit published on  15.06.2016  [2016/24]
06.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
29.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.06.2016  [2016/22]
22.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
15.04.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.05.2016  [2016/20]
19.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
12.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.03.2016  [2016/11]
05.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.03.2016  [2016/10]
29.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.03.2016  [2016/09]
22.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.02.2016  [2016/08]
15.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
05.06.2015 (Expected) grant published on  08.07.2015  [2015/28]
13.05.2015 Change - representative
30.04.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.03.2015 Change - applicant published on  22.04.2015  [2015/17]
17.03.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
17.03.2015 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
14.03.2015 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
14.11.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.06.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.06.2013 Amendment by applicant
07.06.2013 Request for examination filed published on  10.07.2013  [2013/28]
07.06.2013 Change - designated states published on  10.07.2013  [2013/28]
04.12.2012 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.12.2012  [2012/49]