blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2689761 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2689761



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 98
16.12.2014 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
04.09.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
03.02.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
07.01.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
27.03.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 7
22.03.2013 Document concerning representation Search / examination 7
14.12.2012 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.12.2012 European search opinion Search / examination 2
14.12.2012 European search report Search / examination 2
11.10.2012 EPO/applicant correspondence crossed Search / examination 1
26.09.2012 Invitation to file authorisation Search / examination 1
24.09.2012 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
24.09.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.09.2012 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.09.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9
05.09.2012 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 15
22.08.2012 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.08.2012 Claims Search / examination 2
22.08.2012 Description Search / examination 7
22.08.2012 Drawings Search / examination 4
22.08.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.08.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.07.2012 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
26.07.2012 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9
26.07.2012 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 15