blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2689761


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
19.12.2014 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  21.01.2015  [2015/04]
03.09.2014 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
30.08.2014 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
28.01.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.01.2014  [2014/05]