Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2689761

EP2689761 - Stretcher with a movable headrest, its use and a movable headrest assembly for stretchers or beds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.12.2014
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.12.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.01.2015  [2015/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fundación para la Investigación del hospital Universitario y Politécnico de la Fe
Avenida Bulevar Sur, s/n
46026 Valencia / ES
[2014/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Jiménez Buselo, Maria Teresa
Calle Huerto Ridaura 4, 3C
46026 Valencia / ES
 [2014/05]
Representative(s)Torner Lasalle, Elisabet , et al
Torner, Juncosa I Associats, S.L. C/Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 669 bis 1r 2a
08013 Barcelona / ES
[2014/05]
Application number, filing date12380038.526.07.2012
[2014/05]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2689761
Date:29.01.2014
Language:EN
[2014/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.12.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61G1/04
[2014/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Krankenbahre mit beweglicher Kopfstütze, deren Verwendung und eine bewegliche Kopfstützenanordnung für Krankenbahren oder Betten[2014/05]
English:Stretcher with a movable headrest, its use and a movable headrest assembly for stretchers or beds[2014/05]
French:Brancard muni d'un appuie-tête mobile, son utilisation et ensemble appuie-tête mobile pour civières ou lits[2014/05]
Examination procedure30.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/04]
04.09.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/04]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201403   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US6108840  (HEIMBROCK RICHARD H [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,9-13 * column 16, line 52 - column 18, line 10; figures 1,8-10 * [I] 2,7,8;
 [XI]US4620697  (PITHON FRANCOIS [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,9-13 * column 2, line 61 - column 4, line 5; figures 1-4 * [I] 4,7,8;
 [XI]US2002170116  (BORDERS RICHARD L [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3,4,9-13 * paragraphs [0159] - [0221]; figures 1,10-34 * [I] 2,5,7,8;
 [XI]US4674140  (BOONANTS MARIUS [BE] ET AL) [X] 1,2,10-13 * column 3, lines 30-40; figure 1 * [I] 4,5,9;
 [XI]US3188079  (BOETCKER CARL H ET AL) [X] 1-3,9-13 * column 1, line 67 - column 3, line 29; figures 1-5 * [I] 4
by applicantDE10122770
 ES2269876T
 ES2311750T
 ES2261075
 JPH0535128U
 US773720
 US6935340
 EP1844743