Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2703003

EP2703003 - A pomegranate extract and compositions containing pomegranate polyphenols for treating or preventing diseases or physiopathological conditions associated with an excessive gene expression and/or physiological activity of interleukin-6 [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.12.2017  [2017/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Probelte Biotecnologia S.L.
Ctra. Madrid, Km. 389
Poligono Industrial El Tiro
30100 Espinardo Murcia / ES
[2014/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Streitenberger, Sergio A.
Madre Teresa de Calcuta, 1 C11
30120 El Palmar (Murcia) / ES
02 / Lopez Mas, José A.
de la Estación 1, 1B
30840 Alhama de Murcia (Murcia) / ES
 [2014/10]
Representative(s)Temiño Ceniceros, Ignacio , et al
Abril Abogados
Amador de los Rios 1-1°
28010 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2014/10]Gislon, Gabriele , et al
Torner, Juncosa i Associats, S.L. C/Gran Via de les Corts Catalanes, 669bis, 1r 2a
08013 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date12380043.531.08.2012
[2014/10]
Filing languageES
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2703003
Date:05.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/185, A61P19/00, A61P17/14
[2014/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Granatapfelextrakt und Zusammensetzungen mit Polyphenolen aus Granatäpfeln zur Behandlung oder Vorbeugung von Krankheiten oder physiopathologischen Zuständen, die mit einer überschiessenden Genexpression und/oder physiologischen Aktivität von Interleukin-6 einhergehen[2014/10]
English:A pomegranate extract and compositions containing pomegranate polyphenols for treating or preventing diseases or physiopathological conditions associated with an excessive gene expression and/or physiological activity of interleukin-6[2014/10]
French:Extrait du grenade et compositions avec des polyphenols des grenades pour le traitement et la prevention des maladies ou des conditions physiopathologiques associées avec un excès d'expression des genes et/ou de l'activité physiologique de l'interleukine-6[2014/10]
Examination procedure01.09.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
04.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.02.2017Observations by third parties
04.07.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/49]
31.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.02.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
04.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2008084282  (AVESTHA GENGRAINE TECH PVT LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9 * example -; claim - *;
 [X]JP2003102431  ;
 [X]JP2000247896  ;
 [X]JP2005089304  ;
 [XI]JP2011068601  ;
 [XI]FR2968214  (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-3,6-10 * example -; claim - * [I] 11-15;
 [XI]WO2011051633  (OREAL [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,6-9,13 * page 9, line 36 - page 10, line 15; example -; claim - * [I] 10-12,14,15
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 70, Database accession no. 2003-735551, XP002688941 & JP2003102431 A 20030408 (PERUSHAZAKURO YAKUHIN KK) [X] 1-4,7-9 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 65, Database accession no. 2000-667393, XP002688942 & JP2000247896 A 20000912 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD) [X] 1-4,7-9 * abstract *
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 28, Database accession no. 2005-267550, XP002688943 & JP2005089304 A 20050407 (NIPPON MENARD KESHOHIN KK) [X] 1-4,7-9 * abstract *
 [X]  - MORI-OKAMOTO J ET AL, "Pomegranate extract improves a depressive state and bone properties in menopausal syndrome model ovariectomized mice", JOURNAL OF ETHNOPHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHERS LTD, IE, (20040101), vol. 92, doi:10.1016/J.JEP.2004.02.006, ISSN 0378-8741, pages 93 - 101, XP002497183 [X] 1-4,7-9 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jep.2004.02.006
 [I]  - RASHEED ZAFAR ET AL, "Polyphenol-rich pomegranate fruit extract (POMx) suppresses PMACI-induced expression of pro-inflammatory cytokines by inhibiting the activation of MAP Kinases and NF-Î B in human KU812 cells", JOURNAL OF INFLAMMATION, BIOMED CENTRAL, LONDON, GB, (20090108), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1476-9255-6-1, ISSN 1476-9255, page 1, XP021050255 [I] 1-4,7-9 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1476-9255-6-1
 [I]  - YOUNG HO KIM ET AL, "Stimulation of osteoblastic differentiation and inhibition of interleukin-6 and nitric oxide in MC3T3-E1 cells by pomegranate ethanol extract", PHYTOTHERAPY RESEARCH, (20090501), vol. 23, no. 5, doi:10.1002/ptr.2587, ISSN 0951-418X, pages 737 - 739, XP055046935 [I] 1-4,7-9 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ptr.2587
 [XI]  - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2011, no. 27, Database accession no. 2011-D56522, XP002693581 & JP2011068601 A 20110407 (KOEI KOGYO KK) [X] 1-3,6-9 * abstract * [I] 10-15
by applicantUS4596812
 EP0724444
 US2006120980
 US2007036742
 US2010247428
 EP1967079