Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2732895

EP2732895 - Machine tool for manufacturing profiles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.08.2016
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Burri Werkzeugmaschinen GmbH & Co. KG
Im Wasen 9
78667 Villingendorf / DE
[2014/21]
Inventor(s)01 / * * *
 [2014/21]
Representative(s)Klocke, Peter
ABACUS
Patentanwälte
Lise-Meitner-Strasse 21
72202 Nagold / DE
[2014/21]
Application number, filing date12401231.114.11.2012
[2014/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2732895
Date:21.05.2014
Language:DE
[2014/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2732895
Date:21.10.2015
Language:DE
[2015/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.2013
ClassificationInternational:B23F5/22, B23F17/00, B23F5/04, B23F1/02, B23F1/06, B23F23/12
[2015/35]
Former International [2014/21]B23F23/12, B23F1/02, B23F1/06, B23F5/04, B23F5/22
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/43]
Former [2014/21]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Werkzeugmaschine zur Herstellung von Profilen[2014/21]
English:Machine tool for manufacturing profiles[2014/21]
French:Machine-outil pour la fabrication de profilés[2014/21]
Examination procedure07.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.08.2013Examination requested  [2014/21]
27.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.08.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.09.2015Fee for grant paid
08.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.05.2014
Opposition(s)22.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.11.2012
AL21.10.2015
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
GR21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
TR21.10.2015
IE14.11.2015
LU14.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
FR21.12.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU14.11.2012
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
GR21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
TR21.10.2015
IE14.11.2015
LU14.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
FR21.12.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2018/31]HU14.11.2012
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
GR21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MK21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
IE14.11.2015
LU14.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
FR21.12.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2018/02]HU14.11.2012
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
GR21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
IE14.11.2015
LU14.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
FR21.12.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2017/39]HU14.11.2012
BG21.10.2015
CY21.10.2015
CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
GR21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
MT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
IE14.11.2015
BE30.11.2015
FR21.12.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/50]CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
IE14.11.2015
FR21.12.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SI21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
IE14.11.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/45]CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
IE14.11.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/39]CZ21.10.2015
DK21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
SM21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ21.10.2015
EE21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RO21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
SK21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ21.10.2015
ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/33]ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
MC21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/25]ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
LV21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/24]ES21.10.2015
FI21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
PL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
PT22.02.2016
Former [2016/23]ES21.10.2015
HR21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
RS21.10.2015
SE21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/22]ES21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NL21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
IS21.02.2016
Former [2016/21]ES21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
NO21.01.2016
Former [2016/20]ES21.10.2015
LT21.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2002103139  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2003113177  (FAHRER SIEGFRIED [DE] ET AL) [Y] 1-7 * abstract *;
 [A]US4961289  (SULZER GERD [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010304642  (MUNDT ALOIS [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2012225614  (OCHI MASASHI [JP] ET AL) [A] 2-4 * figure - *;
 [A]US2009227182  (BREITH THOMAS [DE] ET AL) [A] 5,6 * the whole document *