EP2661465 - SEALING MATERIAL OF POLYPROPYLENE WITH IMPROVED OPTICAL PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REICHELT, Kristin Dambachstraße 13 A-4501 Neuhofen/Krems / AT | 02 /
STOCKREITER, Wolfgang Hohe Straße 183 A-4048 Puchenau / AT | 03 /
AGUAYO ARELLANO, Pablo Ivan Franz Weinbergerstrasse 34 A-4060 Leonding-Doppl / AT | [2014/09] |
Former [2013/46] | 01 /
REICHELT, Kristin Dambachstraße 13 A-4501 Neuhofen/Krems / AT | ||
02 /
STOCKREITER, Wolfgang Hohe Straße 183 A-4048 Puchenau / AT | |||
03 /
AGUAYO ARELLANO, Pablo Ivan Hainzenbachstrasse 91/ EG/2 A-4060 Leonding / AT | Representative(s) | Lux, Berthold Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Lux, Berthold Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12700001.6 | 02.01.2012 | [2016/14] | WO2012EP50001 | Priority number, date | EP20110150025 | 03.01.2011 Original published format: EP 11150025 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012093098 | Date: | 12.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2661465 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2661465 | Date: | 06.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/12, C08L23/14, C08J5/18, C08F210/06, C08F210/14, C08F210/16, C09J123/14 | [2015/51] | CPC: |
C08L23/12 (EP,US);
C09J123/14 (US);
C08F210/06 (US);
C08F210/14 (US);
C08F210/16 (US);
C08L23/14 (EP,US);
C08L23/142 (EP,US);
C08F2500/00 (US);
C08F2500/12 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/06, C08F2/001 (US,EP);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/06 (US,EP);
C08L23/142, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/14, C08L2666/06 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2013/46] | C08L23/12, C08L23/14, C08J5/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABDICHTUNGSMATERIAL AUS POLYPROPYLEN MIT VERBESSERTER OPTISCHER ERSCHEINUNG | [2013/46] | English: | SEALING MATERIAL OF POLYPROPYLENE WITH IMPROVED OPTICAL PERFORMANCE | [2013/46] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ EN POLYPROPYLÈNE, À PERFORMANCE OPTIQUE AMÉLIORÉE | [2013/46] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 17.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.01.2012 | AL | 06.04.2016 | AT | 06.04.2016 | BG | 06.04.2016 | CY | 06.04.2016 | CZ | 06.04.2016 | DK | 06.04.2016 | EE | 06.04.2016 | FI | 06.04.2016 | HR | 06.04.2016 | LT | 06.04.2016 | LV | 06.04.2016 | MC | 06.04.2016 | MK | 06.04.2016 | PL | 06.04.2016 | RO | 06.04.2016 | RS | 06.04.2016 | SE | 06.04.2016 | SI | 06.04.2016 | SK | 06.04.2016 | SM | 06.04.2016 | TR | 06.04.2016 | NO | 06.07.2016 | GR | 07.07.2016 | IS | 06.08.2016 | PT | 08.08.2016 | IE | 02.01.2017 | LU | 02.01.2017 | MT | 02.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 02.01.2012 | |
AL | 06.04.2016 | ||
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
MK | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.01.2017 | ||
LU | 02.01.2017 | ||
MT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 02.01.2012 | |
AL | 06.04.2016 | ||
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CY | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.01.2017 | ||
LU | 02.01.2017 | ||
MT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 02.01.2012 | |
AL | 06.04.2016 | ||
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
BG | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.01.2017 | ||
LU | 02.01.2017 | ||
MT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 02.01.2012 | |
AL | 06.04.2016 | ||
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.01.2017 | ||
LU | 02.01.2017 | ||
MT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 06.04.2016 | |
AT | 06.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.01.2017 | ||
LU | 02.01.2017 | ||
MT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.01.2017 | ||
LU | 02.01.2017 | ||
MT | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
IE | 02.01.2017 | ||
LU | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/02] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
LU | 02.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
MC | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SI | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
SM | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
SK | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
CZ | 06.04.2016 | ||
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
EE | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RO | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
DK | 06.04.2016 | ||
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
SE | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 08.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 06.04.2016 | |
FI | 06.04.2016 | ||
HR | 06.04.2016 | ||
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
LV | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
RS | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 06.04.2016 | |
LT | 06.04.2016 | ||
PL | 06.04.2016 | ||
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NO | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 06.04.2016 | |
NO | 06.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0011076 (MONTECH USA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [Y]WO2004087419 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [Y] 1-17 * claim 1 * * page 1, line 1 - line 24 * * page 13; examples 1,2; table 1 *; | [A]EP2014714 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP2147939 (BOREALIS AG [AT]) [Y] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0006] , [0041] - [0045] * * page 13 - page 14; examples 1,2; table 1 * | by applicant | WO9212182 | EP0591224 | EP0887379 | WO9858976 | WO0148034 | WO03051934 | WO2006069733 | EP1741725 | EP1801157 | EP1847551 | EP1847552 | - PURE APPL. CHEM., (1996), vol. 68, no. 8, pages 1591 - 1595 | - RESCONI ET AL., CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (2000), vol. 100, no. 4, page 1263 | - BUSICO, V.; CIPULLO, R., PROG. POLYM. SCI., (2001), vol. 26, page 443 | - BUSICO, V.; CIPULLO, R.; MONACO, G.; VACATELLO, M.; SEGRE, A.L., MACROMOLEUCLES, (1997), vol. 30, page 6251 | - ZHOU, Z.; KUEMMERLE, R.; QIU, X.; REDWINE, D.; CONG, R.; TAHA, A.; BAUGH, D.; WINNIFORD, B., J. MAG. RESON., (2007), vol. 187, page 225 | - BUSICO, V.; CARBONNIERE, P.; CIPULLO, R.; PELLECCHIA, R.; SEVERN, J.; TALARICO, G., MACROMOL. RAPID COMMUN., (2007), vol. 28, page 11289 | - SINGH, G.; KOTHARI, A.; GUPTA, V., POLYMER TESTING, (2009), vol. 28 5, page 475 | - MACROMOL. RAPID COMMUN., (2007), vol. 28, page 11289 | - RESCONI, L.; CAVALLO, L.; FAIT, A.; PIEMONTESI, F., CHEM. REV., (2000), vol. 100, page 1253 | - WANG, W-J.; ZHU, S., MACROMOLECULES, (2000), vol. 33, page 1157 | - CHENG, H. N., MACROMOLECULES, (1984), vol. 17, page 1950 | - KAKUGO, M.; NAITO, Y.; MIZUNUMA, K.; MIYATAKE, T., MACROMOLECULES, (1982), vol. 15, page 1150 | - RANDALL, J. MACROMOL. SCI., REV. MACROMOL. CHEM. PHYS., (1989), vol. C29, page 201 |