Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2789198


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
08.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
27.10.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
14.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.08.2017  [2017/33]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
16.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
09.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.07.2017  [2017/28]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
18.11.2016 (Expected) grant published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
16.11.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.11.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.11.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
10.07.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
24.06.2016 Change - classification published on  27.07.2016  [2016/30]
24.06.2016 Change - classification published on  27.07.2016  [2016/30]
03.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
17.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
05.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.09.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
12.09.2014 Request for examination filed published on  15.10.2014  [2014/42]
29.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
08.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
15.07.2014 Amendment by applicant
15.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
23.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
12.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
25.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
27.01.2012 PCT data prior to European publication