Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2789198

EP2789198 - POWER CONTROL IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSIONS WITH COORDINATED RECEPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.10.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.11.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2016/51]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / SOLDATI, Pablo
c/o Huawei Technologies Sweden AB
Skalholtsgatan 9
S-16440 Kista / SE
02 / POPOVIC, Branislav
c/o Huawei Technologies
Bråvallagatan 14
S-113 66 Stockholm / SE
 [2014/42]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2016/51]
Former [2014/42]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date12700372.102.01.2012
[2016/51]
WO2012EP50006
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013102485
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2789198
Date:15.10.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2789198
Date:21.12.2016
Language:EN
[2016/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/14, H04W52/24, H04W52/10, H04B7/02
[2016/30]
Former International [2014/42]H04W52/14, H04W52/24, H04B7/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LEISTUNGSREGELUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM FÜR AUFWÄRTSÜBERTRAGUNGEN MIT KOORDINIERTEM EMPFANG[2014/42]
English:POWER CONTROL IN A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM FOR UPLINK TRANSMISSIONS WITH COORDINATED RECEPTION[2014/42]
French:COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL POUR DES TRANSMISSIONS EN LIAISON MONTANTE AVEC RÉCEPTION COORDONNÉE[2014/42]
Entry into regional phase11.07.2014National basic fee paid 
11.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
11.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/42]
16.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.10.2016Fee for grant paid
28.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.07.2016
Opposition(s)22.09.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.01.2012
AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CY21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
MK21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
IE02.01.2017
LU02.01.2017
MT02.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]HU02.01.2012
AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CY21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
IE02.01.2017
LU02.01.2017
MT02.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2019/31]HU02.01.2012
AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
IE02.01.2017
LU02.01.2017
MT02.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/43]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
IE02.01.2017
LU02.01.2017
MT02.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2018/13]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SI21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
IE02.01.2017
LU02.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/51]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
LU02.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/50]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
DK21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
CH31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
FR21.02.2017
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/42]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
MC21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/41]AT21.12.2016
BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
IT21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
SM21.12.2016
BG21.03.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
PT21.04.2017
Former [2017/36]BE21.12.2016
CZ21.12.2016
EE21.12.2016
ES21.12.2016
FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
PL21.12.2016
RO21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
SK21.12.2016
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
IS21.04.2017
Former [2017/31]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
NL21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/28]FI21.12.2016
HR21.12.2016
LT21.12.2016
LV21.12.2016
RS21.12.2016
SE21.12.2016
BE31.01.2017
NO21.03.2017
GR22.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV21.12.2016
Cited inInternational search[XAI]WO2010107885  (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]; SHIN SUNG-HYUK [US]; PIETRASKI PHIL) [X] 1-5,13,15,21 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0084] * [A] 10,11,16 [I] 6-9,12,14,17-20;
 [A]WO2010127623  (DA TANG MOBILE COMMUNICATION EQUIP CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0033] *;
 EP2429244  [ ] (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0033] *;
 [A]WO2010150807  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]; NISHIKAWA DAISUKE [JP]; KISHIYAMA YOSHIHISA [JP]) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0103] *;
 EP2448338  [ ] (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP])