Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2665607

EP2665607 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTILAYER DATA CARRIER AND DATA CARRIER PRODUCED BY SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.03.2018
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
01.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gemalto AG
Hintere Bahnhofstrasse 12
5000 Aarau / CH
[2015/28]
Former [2013/48]For all designated states
Trüb AG
Hintere Bahnhofstrasse 12
5001 Aarau / CH
Inventor(s)01 / EGLI, Stefan
Hochstrasse 69
CH-4053 Basel / CH
02 / WIDMER GOMRES, Heidi
Juraweg 12
CH-3046 Wahlendorf / CH
 [2013/48]
Representative(s)Frischknecht, Harry Ralph
Isler & Pedrazzini AG
Giesshübelstrasse 45
Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2013/48]Frischknecht, Harry Ralph
Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772
8027 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date12700772.213.01.2012
WO2012CH00008
Priority number, dateCH2011000861118.01.2011         Original published format: CH 86112011
[2013/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012097463
Date:26.07.2012
Language:DE
[2012/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2665607
Date:27.11.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2012
[2013/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2665607
Date:15.04.2015
Language:DE
[2015/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.07.2012
ClassificationInternational:B42D25/00
[2014/30]
Former International [2013/48]B42D15/10
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/48]
Extension statesBA18.07.2013
ME18.07.2013
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRSCHICHTIGEN DATENTRÄGERS SOWIE NACH DIESEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTER DATENTRÄGER[2013/48]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A MULTILAYER DATA CARRIER AND DATA CARRIER PRODUCED BY SAID METHOD[2013/48]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN SUPPORT DE DONNÉES MULTICOUCHE ET SUPPORT DE DONNÉES FABRIQUÉ SELON LEDIT PROCÉDÉ[2013/48]
Entry into regional phase18.07.2013National basic fee paid 
18.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
18.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/48]
24.02.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
05.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2015Fee for grant paid
06.03.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.03.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP14164941.8  / EP2756963
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.07.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.01.2016  02.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Giesecke+Devrient Mobile Security GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
 [2019/21]
Former [2018/13]
Opponent(s)01  15.01.2016  02.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Giesecke+Devrient Mobile Security GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
Former [2018/10]
Opponent(s)01  15.01.2016  02.02.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Patent und Lizenzen
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch
Patentanwälte
Destouchesstraße 68
80796 München / DE
Former [2016/08]
Opponent(s)01  15.01.2016   
Giesecke & Devrient GmbH
Patent und Lizenzen
Prinzregentenstrasse 159
81677 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
19.02.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.08.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.02.2018Date of oral proceedings
14.03.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.03.2018Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition11.05.2018Appeal received No.  T1212/18
11.07.2018Statement of grounds filed
10.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE4410431  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-7,10-19 * column 4, line 11 - line 29 *;
 [Y]DE102007034716  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-4,10-19 * paragraph [0061] *;
 [YA]EP0159828  (COMPUTER IDENTIFICATION SYST [US]) [Y] 5-7 * figure 4 * [A] 8,9;
 [Y]US2008136160  (LEENDERS LUC [BE]) [Y] 10-12,18,19 * paragraph [0155] *
by applicantEP1691989
 EP2109014
 WO2009139800
 EP0420261
OppositionDE102007034716
 DE159828
 US2008136160
 DE10007916
 EP1501045
 EP1197350