Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2805476

EP2805476 - ICE BASED NAT TRAVERSAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2015/29]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2014/48]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (Publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / BLAU, Staffan
Tallstubbsbacken 1
S-163 54 Spånga / SE
02 / PRZYBYSZ, Hubert
Telefonvägen 27
2tr
S-126 37 Hägersten / SE
 [2014/48]
Representative(s)Lind, Robert
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[2014/48]
Application number, filing date12700969.417.01.2012
[2016/01]
WO2012EP50663
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013107504
Date:25.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/30]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2805476
Date:26.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013
[2014/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2805476
Date:06.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/12, H04L29/06
[2015/32]
Former International [2014/48]H04L29/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/48]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:NAT-T AUF ICE-BASIS[2014/48]
English:ICE BASED NAT TRAVERSAL[2014/48]
French:TRAVERSÉE NAT BASÉE SUR UN ICE[2014/48]
Entry into regional phase03.06.2014National basic fee paid 
03.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
03.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.11.2013Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/48]
20.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.11.2015Fee for grant paid
05.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.07.2015
Opposition(s)07.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.01.2012
AL06.01.2016
AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CY06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
MK06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
TR06.01.2016
IE17.01.2016
LU17.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
FR07.03.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU17.01.2012
AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CY06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
MK06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
TR06.01.2016
IE17.01.2016
LU17.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
FR07.03.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2018/31]HU17.01.2012
AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CY06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
MK06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
IE17.01.2016
LU17.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
FR07.03.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2018/28]HU17.01.2012
AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
MK06.01.2016
MT06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
IE17.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
FR07.03.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2017/47]AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
MT06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
IE17.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
FR07.03.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2017/16]AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SI06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
IE17.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
FR07.03.2016
BG06.04.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2017/10]AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
IE17.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
FR07.03.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2017/07]AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
IE17.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT06.01.2016
BE06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/50]AT06.01.2016
CZ06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RO06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
SK06.01.2016
SM06.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/49]AT06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
EE06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
MC06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT06.01.2016
DK06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
LV06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
RS06.01.2016
SE06.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
IS06.05.2016
PT06.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT06.01.2016
ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
IT06.01.2016
LT06.01.2016
PL06.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
Former [2016/35]ES06.01.2016
FI06.01.2016
HR06.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO06.04.2016
GR07.04.2016
Former [2016/24]BE31.01.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]US2008062993  (LEVY THOMAS [FR] ET AL) [A] 1-18 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0047] *;
 [XDI]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Core Network and Terminals; IP multimedia call control protocol based on Session Initiation Protocol (SIP) and Session Description Protocol (SDP); Stage 3 (Release 11)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 24.229, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120104), vol. CT WG1, no. V11.2.1, pages 1 - 716, XP050555158 [XD] 8,10,11,17 * sections: 6.2, 6.7.2.1, 6.7.2.5, 6.7.2.6, 6.7.2.7.1, Annex K; * [I] 13,14
 [XI]  - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); LTE; IP Multimedia Subsystem (IMS); Stage 2 (3GPP TS 23.228 version 10.7.0 Release 10)", TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS; FRANCE, (20120101), vol. 3GPP SA 2, no. V10.7.0, XP014069286 [X] 8,10,11,17 * Annex G; * [I] 13,14
 [A]  - LM ERICSSON, "Discussion on P-CSCF/AGW procedures for ICE and HNT", 3GPP DRAFT; C1-072366, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX; FRANCE, (20071001), vol. CT WG1, no. Kobe, Japan; 20071001, pages 1 - 3, XP050026512 [A] 1-18 * page 1 - page 3 *