Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2800508

EP2800508 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING SIGNAL TO NOISE RATIO FOR HIGH FREQUENCY SIGNAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.04.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 30.10.2019 [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Drägerwerk AG & Co. KGaA
Moislinger Allee 53-55
23558 Lübeck / DE
[2019/10]
Former [2018/37]For all designated states
Draeger Medical Systems, Inc.
6 Tech Drive
Andover, MA 01810 / US
Former [2014/46]For all designated states
Draeger Medical Systems, Inc.
6 Tech Drive
Andover, MA 01810 / US
Inventor(s)01 / QIN, Derek, Yong
3 Karlton Circle
Andover, MA 01810 / US
02 / MAURER, David, Christopher
19 Forest Street
Stoneham, MA 02180 / US
03 / RISHER-KELLY, Clifford, Mark
149 Ell Pond Road
Wells, ME 04090 / US
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2018/37]Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Former [2014/46]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte
Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date12701201.106.01.2012
[2018/37]
WO2012US20462
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013103353
Date:11.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2800508
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.07.2013
[2014/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2800508
Date:12.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, G16H40/63
[2018/14]
Former International [2014/46]A61B5/0428, H03M1/06, H03G3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG EINES SIGNAL-RAUSCH-VERHÄLTNISSES FÜR EINE HOCHFREQUENZSIGNALKOMPONENTE[2014/46]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPROVING SIGNAL TO NOISE RATIO FOR HIGH FREQUENCY SIGNAL COMPONENT[2014/46]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DE RAPPORT SIGNAL SUR BRUIT POUR COMPOSANTE DE SIGNAL HAUTE FRÉQUENCE[2014/46]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2014National basic fee paid 
09.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
06.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2018Fee for grant paid
01.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.04.2018
Opposition(s)13.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
29.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
MC12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
LU06.01.2019
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
[2019/44]
Former [2019/40]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
MC12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/37]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SI12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
DK12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
SM12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
PT12.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL12.09.2018
AT12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
EE12.09.2018
ES12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
SK12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL12.09.2018
CZ12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
PL12.09.2018
RO12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
IT12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
IS12.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
NL12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL12.09.2018
FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
LV12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI12.09.2018
HR12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
RS12.09.2018
SE12.09.2018
BG12.12.2018
NO12.12.2018
GR13.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI12.09.2018
LT12.09.2018
NO12.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT12.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2002099300  (KOVTUN VLADIMIR V [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,7-11 * the whole document * [I] 3,4,12;
 [XI]US7942824  (KAYYALI HANI [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4-11 * column 40, line 13 - column 42, line 54 * [I] 3,12;
 [A]US2011301428  (FU YONGJI [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0025] - [0040]; figure -; claim - *;
 [A]EP0542413  (STUART MEDICAL INC [US] PROTOCOL SYS INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 6, line 55 - column 9, line 19 *