Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802730

EP2802730 - PIPE IN PIPE BHA ELECTRIC DRIVE MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.09.2018  [2018/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
10200 Bellaire Boulevard
Houston, TX 77072 / US
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Halliburton Energy Services, Inc.
10200 Bellaire Blvd. 8
Houston, Texas 77072 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HAY, Richard, Thomas
24915 Corbin Gate Drive
Spring, TX 77389 / US
02 / HOLTZMAN, Keith, E.
8213 Simms Court
Arvada, CO 80005 / US
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2014/47]
Application number, filing date12701398.511.01.2012
WO2012US20929
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013105952
Date:18.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802730
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013
[2014/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.07.2013
ClassificationInternational:E21B17/00, E21B17/02
[2014/47]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHER ROHR-IN-ROHR-BHA-ANTRIEBSMOTOR[2014/47]
English:PIPE IN PIPE BHA ELECTRIC DRIVE MOTOR[2014/47]
French:MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE BHA TUYAU DANS TUYAU[2014/47]
Entry into regional phase22.07.2014National basic fee paid 
22.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
22.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
23.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.03.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/37]
25.04.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2018/37]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
08.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201807   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XYI]US4500263  (MOHN FRANK [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,8-10,12 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 3; claim 7 * [Y] 6,7,13-20 [I] 4,11;
 [Y]US2011036560  (VAIL III WILLIAM BANNING [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,13-20 * paragraph [0709] - paragraph [0720] *;
 [A]US4690212  (TERMOHLEN DAVID E [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *