Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2802730


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
10.08.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
24.04.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
08.03.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
08.11.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
09.12.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
19.01.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
26.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
13.03.2015 Change - extension states published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
17.01.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
17.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  19.11.2014  [2014/47]
15.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
25.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
02.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
19.07.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
08.02.2012 PCT data prior to European publication