blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2664039

EP2664039 - CORONA IGNITER HAVING CONTROLLED LOCATION OF CORONA FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  30.07.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.07.2021Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 01.09.2021  [2021/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Ignition LLC
27300 West Eleven Mile Road
Southfield, MI 48034 / US
[2019/31]
Former [2013/47]For all designated states
Federal-Mogul Ignition Company
26555 Northwestern Highway
Southfield, MI 48033 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BURROWS, John, A.
22 Yew Tree Drive
Northwich CW8 4NR / GB
02 / LYKOWSKI, James, D.
1609 W. Dean Road
Temperance MI 48182 / US
03 / PERMUY, Alfred
59] Avenue de Colmar
F-92500 Rueil-malmaison / FR
04 / HAMPTON, Keith
415 Barton Drive
Ann Arbor MI 48105 / US
 [2013/47]
Representative(s)Marchitelli, Mauro
Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A.
Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6
10123 Torino / IT
[2021/35]
Former [2013/47]Marchitelli, Mauro
Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18
10123 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date12701412.413.01.2012
[2021/35]
WO2012US21302
Priority number, dateUS201161432364P13.01.2011         Original published format: US 201161432364 P
US201161432520P13.01.2011         Original published format: US 201161432520 P
[2013/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2012097290
Date:19.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2664039
Date:20.11.2013
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2013/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2664039
Date:24.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/26]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP2664039
Date:01.09.2021
Language:EN
[2021/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.07.2012
ClassificationIPC:H01T13/50, H01T13/52, H01T21/02
[2013/47]
CPC:
H01T13/50 (EP,KR,US); H01T13/52 (EP,KR,US); H01T21/02 (EP,KR,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/47]
TitleGerman:KORONA-ZÜNDER MIT GESTEUERTER ORTUNG VON KORONA-BILDUNGEN[2013/47]
English:CORONA IGNITER HAVING CONTROLLED LOCATION OF CORONA FORMATION[2013/47]
French:ALLUMEUR EN COURONNE PRÉSENTANT UN EMPLACEMENT CONTRÔLÉ DE FORMATION DE COURONNE[2013/47]
Entry into regional phase17.07.2013National basic fee paid 
17.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
17.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.11.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/47]
05.11.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2015Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
13.02.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2015Fee for grant paid
12.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.11.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.12.2015    ADMISSIBLE
BorgWarner Ludwigsburg GmbH
Mörikestrasse 155
71636 Ludwigsburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Mommer, Niels, et al, et al
Twelmeier Mommer & Partner Westliche Karl-Friedrich-Strasse 56-68
75172 Pforzheim / DE
 [2016/01]
04.05.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.11.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
09.11.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.11.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.04.2021Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
21.05.2021Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
22.07.2021Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition19.01.2018Appeal received No.  T0191/18
16.03.2018Statement of grounds filed
23.04.2021Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU13.01.2012
AL24.06.2015
AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
TR24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
GB13.01.2016
IE13.01.2016
LU13.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/31]HU13.01.2012
AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
TR24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
GB13.01.2016
IE13.01.2016
LU13.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
Former [2018/29]HU13.01.2012
AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
TR24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
GB13.01.2016
IE13.01.2016
LU13.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2018/28]HU13.01.2012
AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CY24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MK24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
SM24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
GB13.01.2016
IE13.01.2016
LU13.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2017/40]AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
MT24.06.2015
NL24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SE24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
GB13.01.2016
IE13.01.2016
LU13.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2017/07]AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
GB13.01.2016
IE13.01.2016
LU13.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2017/03]AT24.06.2015
BE24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
GB13.01.2016
LU13.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2016/47]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
GB13.01.2016
LU13.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2016/46]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
LU13.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
Former [2016/42]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
MC24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
LU13.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
Former [2016/39]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
LU13.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
Former [2016/36]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SI24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
BE31.01.2016
Former [2016/24]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
BE31.01.2016
Former [2016/20]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
DK24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/11]AT24.06.2015
CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/10]CZ24.06.2015
EE24.06.2015
ES24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
PL24.06.2015
RO24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
SK24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
IS24.10.2015
PT26.10.2015
Former [2016/09]EE24.06.2015
FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Former [2015/50]FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
BG24.09.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Former [2015/49]FI24.06.2015
HR24.06.2015
LT24.06.2015
LV24.06.2015
RS24.06.2015
NO24.09.2015
GR25.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[XI]US5731654  (BENEDIKT WALTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,8,11,12,17,19-21 * abstract * * column 3, line 40 - line 65; figures 3,4 * [I] 5-7,9,10,13-16,18;
 [AD]US2010083942  (LYKOWSKI JAMES [US], et al) [AD] 1,19-21 * abstract *
OppositionUS5731654
 US2010083942
 FR2859831
 US4841925
 DE102010042318
 US6883507
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.