Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2810197

EP2810197 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN INFUSION PARAMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2019
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.03.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brainlab AG
Olof-Palme-Straße 9
81829 München / DE
For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
[2017/09]
Former [2014/50]For all designated states
Brainlab AG
Kapellenstrasse 12
85622 Feldkirchen / DE
For all designated states
The Regents of the University of California
1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor
Oakland, CA 94607 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROSENBLUTH, Kathryn, H.
43 Nordhoff Street
San Francisco, CA 94131 / US
02 / ESCHERMANN, Jan Felix
Isareckstrasse 39
81673 Munich / DE
03 / DOYLE, Joseph
Flemingstrasse 113
81925 Munich / DE
04 / BANKIEWICZ, Krystof
5815 Balmoral Drive
Oakland, CA 94619 / US
05 / MITTERMEYER, Stephan
Filsermayrstr. 2
84036 Landshut / DE
 [2018/14]
Former [2014/50]01 / ROSENBLUTH, Kathryn, H.
43 Nordhoff Street
San Francisco, CA 94131 / US
02 / ESCHERMANN, Jan Felix
Isareckstrasse 39
81673 Munich / DE
03 / DOYLE, Joseph
Flemingstrasse 113
81925 Munich / DE
04 / BANKIEWICZ, Krystof
5815 Balmoral Drive
Oakland, CA 94619 / US
05 / MITTERMEYER, Stephan
Baldurstrasse 13
80637 Munich / DE
Representative(s)SSM Sandmair
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2018/14]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt
Partnerschaft mbB
Joseph-Wild-Straße 20
81829 München / DE
Former [2014/50]Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx
Patentanwälte
Stuntzstraße 16
81677 München / DE
Application number, filing date12701758.002.02.2012
[2018/14]
WO2012EP51751
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013113391
Date:08.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2810197
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2810197
Date:04.04.2018
Language:EN
[2018/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00, A61M5/142
[2014/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES INFUSIONSPARAMETERS[2014/50]
English:METHOD FOR DETERMINING AN INFUSION PARAMETER[2014/50]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UN PARAMÈTRE DE PERFUSION[2014/50]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2014National basic fee paid 
21.03.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
14.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.04.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.07.2017Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.07.2017
27.07.2017Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
16.10.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.01.2018Fee for grant paid
19.01.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17187241.9  / EP3264304
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.04.2016
Opposition(s)07.01.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SI04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
[2019/26]
Former [2019/11]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
IT04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
SM04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AL04.04.2018
AT04.04.2018
CZ04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RO04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
SK04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/09]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
EE04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/08]AL04.04.2018
DK04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2019/03]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
PT06.08.2018
Former [2018/52]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
GR05.07.2018
Former [2018/51]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
LV04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
RS04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
HR04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/49]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
PL04.04.2018
SE04.04.2018
BG04.07.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/47]AL04.04.2018
ES04.04.2018
FI04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/46]AL04.04.2018
LT04.04.2018
NL04.04.2018
NO04.07.2018
Former [2018/43]NL04.04.2018