Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807858

EP2807858 - HANDOVER OF PRIORITY CALLS FROM A CIRCUIT SWITCHED ACCESS NETWORK WITH SINGLE RADIO VOICE CALL CONTINUITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2016Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 04.01.2017  [2017/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / KELLER, Ralf
Talblick 22
DE-52146 Würselen / DE
02 / LINDHOLM, Fredrik
Hornsbergsvägen 18
SE-112 15 Stockholm / SE
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Lind, Robert
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date12702488.327.01.2012
WO2012EP51338
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110345
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807858
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/00
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:WEITERREICHEN VON PRIORITÄTSANRUFEN AUS EINEM LEITUNGSVERMITTELTEN ZUGANGSNETZ MIT EINZELFUNK-SPRACHANRUFKONTINUITÄT[2014/49]
English:HANDOVER OF PRIORITY CALLS FROM A CIRCUIT SWITCHED ACCESS NETWORK WITH SINGLE RADIO VOICE CALL CONTINUITY[2014/49]
French:TRANSFERT INTERCELLULAIRE D'APPELS PRIORITAIRES À PARTIR D'UN RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS À COMMUTATION DE CIRCUITS VIA LA CONTINUITÉ D'APPEL VOCAL RADIO UNIQUE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase26.08.2014National basic fee paid 
26.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
23.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.11.2016Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
27.08.201403   M06   Fee paid on   17.09.2014
Cited inInternational search[I]  - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Single Radio Voice Call Continuity (SRVCC); Stage 2 (Release 11)", 3GPP DRAFT; DRAFT_INTERIM_VERSION_23216-B30+, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20120126), XP050575054 [I] 1-21 * paragraphs [5.2.4] , [5.2.5] * * paragraphs [5.3.2] , [5.3.2a] , [5.3.2b] * * paragraph [6.2.2] * * sentence 6.4 *
 [I]  - 3GPP, "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Single Radio Voice Call Continuity (SRVCC); Stage 2 (Release 11)", 3GPP DRAFT; 23216-B30_CRS_IMPLEMENTED, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20111201), XP050575096 [I] 1-21 * paragraphs [5.2.4] , [5.2.5] * * paragraphs [5.3.2] , [5.3.2a] , [5.3.2b] * * paragraph [6.2.2] *