Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2670447

EP2670447 - Hyaluronic acid composition comprising an ascorbic acid derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2013/50]Hyaluronic acid composition
[2015/03]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.05.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2019Deletion: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Q-Med AB
Seminariegatan 21
752 28 Uppsala / SE
[2013/50]
Inventor(s)01 / EDSMAN, Katarina
Bergsbrunna Villaväg 22
S-757 56 Uppsala / SE
02 / WIEBENSJÖ, Åsa
Nåntuna Backe 52
S-757 59 Uppsala / SE
 [2013/50]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2013/50]Kånge, Lars Rikard
Awapatent AB
Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date12702536.903.02.2012
WO2012EP51875
Priority number, dateEP2011015323203.02.2011         Original published format: EP 11153232
[2013/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012104419
Date:09.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2670447
Date:11.12.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012
[2013/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2670447
Date:01.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/27]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2670447
Date:27.12.2017
[2017/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/00, A61K8/42, A61Q7/00, A61K8/67, A61K45/06, A61K47/36, A61K31/167, A61K31/728, A61K31/445, A61L27/20, A61L27/54, A61L31/04, A61L31/16, A61Q19/08, A61K47/22, A61K31/245, A61K31/375, A61K8/73
[2018/03]
Former International [2013/50]A61L27/14, A61L31/04, A61K8/73, A61Q5/00, A61Q19/08, A61K47/22, A61K47/42, A61K9/00, A61L27/54, A61L31/16, A61L27/20
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/50]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Hyaluronsäurezusammensetzung, die ein Ascorbinsäurederivat enthält[2015/08]
English:Hyaluronic acid composition comprising an ascorbic acid derivative[2015/08]
French:Composition à base d'acide hyaluronique contenant un dérivé d'acide ascorbique[2015/08]
Former [2013/50]HYALURONSÄUREZUSAMMENSETZUNG
Former [2013/50]Hyaluronic acid composition
Former [2013/50]COMPOSITION À BASE D'ACIDE HYALURONIQUE
Entry into regional phase02.09.2013National basic fee paid 
02.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.11.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.09.2013Examination requested  [2013/50]
22.01.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.05.2015Fee for grant paid
13.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP15173636.0  / EP2954907
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.01.2015
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.03.2016  25.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
ALLERGAN, INC.
Patent Department T2 7H
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine CA 92612-1599 / US
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 02  01.04.2016  25.04.2016  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratoires Vivacy
44 rue Paul Valéry
75116 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Tripoz, Inès
Cabinet Tripoz
Le Pôle Sud
22 rue Seguin
69002 Lyon / FR
 [2019/42]
Former [2016/19]
Opponent(s)01  17.03.2016   
ALLERGAN, INC.
Patent Department T2 7H
2525 Dupont Drive
Irvine CA 92612-1599 / US
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 02  01.04.2016   
Laboratoires Vivacy
252 rue Douglas Engelbart
Archamps Technopole
74160 Archamps / FR
Opponent's representative
Tripoz, Inès
Cabinet Tripoz
Le Pôle Sud
22 rue Seguin
69002 Lyon / FR
12.05.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.09.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.11.2017Date of oral proceedings
26.02.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
26.02.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition24.04.2018Appeal received No.  T0747/18
09.07.2018Statement of grounds filed
25.04.2018Appeal received No.  T0747/18
05.07.2018Statement of grounds filed
16.03.2018Appeal received No.  T0747/18
29.06.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.02.2012
AL01.07.2015
AT01.07.2015
BE01.07.2015
BG01.07.2015
CY01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
MC01.07.2015
MK01.07.2015
NL01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SI01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
SM01.07.2015
TR01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
IE03.02.2016
LU03.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/38]HU03.02.2012
AT01.07.2015
BE01.07.2015
BG01.07.2015
CY01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
MC01.07.2015
MK01.07.2015
NL01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SI01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
SM01.07.2015
TR01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
IE03.02.2016
LU03.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
Former [2018/31]HU03.02.2012
AT01.07.2015
BE01.07.2015
CY01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
MC01.07.2015
MK01.07.2015
NL01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SI01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
SM01.07.2015
TR01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
IE03.02.2016
LU03.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
Former [2018/29]HU03.02.2012
AT01.07.2015
BE01.07.2015
CY01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
MC01.07.2015
MK01.07.2015
MT01.07.2015
NL01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SI01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
SM01.07.2015
TR01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
IE03.02.2016
LU03.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2018/28]HU03.02.2012
AT01.07.2015
BE01.07.2015
CY01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
MC01.07.2015
MK01.07.2015
MT01.07.2015
NL01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SI01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
SM01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
IE03.02.2016
LU03.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2017/41]AT01.07.2015
BE01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
MC01.07.2015
MT01.07.2015
NL01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SI01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
IE03.02.2016
LU03.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2017/07]AT01.07.2015
BE01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
MC01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SI01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
IE03.02.2016
LU03.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2017/03]AT01.07.2015
BE01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
MC01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SI01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
LU03.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2016/46]AT01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
MC01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SI01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
LU03.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
Former [2016/43]AT01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
MC01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SI01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
LU03.02.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/42]AT01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
MC01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SI01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/36]AT01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SI01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/24]AT01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/23]AT01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RO01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
SK01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
Former [2016/22]AT01.07.2015
CZ01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
EE01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
Former [2016/20]AT01.07.2015
DK01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
Former [2016/11]AT01.07.2015
FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
Former [2016/10]FI01.07.2015
HR01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
PL01.07.2015
RS01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
IS01.11.2015
PT02.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI01.07.2015
LT01.07.2015
LV01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
GR02.10.2015
Former [2016/08]LT01.07.2015
NO01.10.2015
Former [2016/07]LT01.07.2015
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1884231  (AURIGA INTERNAT S A [BE]) [X] 1-3,12-14,26,28,29,31-35 * column 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * column 2, paragraph 15 - paragraph 21 * * column 3, paragraph 23 - paragraph 24 * * column 4, paragraph 43 - column 5, paragraph 47 * * column 6, paragraph 54 *;
 [XYI]US2006122147  (WOHLRAB DAVID [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,9,12-14,26,28,29 * page 1, paragraph 8 - paragraph 12 * * page 2, paragraph 14 * * examples 3,4 * * claims 1-10 * [Y] 1-40 [I] 1-40;
 [X]WO2009005790  (CARBYLAN BIOSURGERY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12-14,26-29,36,37 * page 2, paragraph 7 * * page 3, paragraph 9 - paragraph 14 * * page 17, paragraph 95 * * page 29, paragraph 134 * * page 24, paragraph 118 * * page 33, paragraph 146 - paragraph 147 *;
 [Y]WO9704012  (AAGERUP BENGT [SE]) [Y] 1,5-7 * examples 3,5,14,15 * * claim 1 *
 [Y]  - EMANUEL ABRAMS AND JOHNSON SANDSOM, "Effect of ascorbic acid on rheumatoid synovial fluid", ANN. RHEUM. DIS., (1964), vol. 23, pages 295 - 299, XP002670273 [Y] 1-40 * page 295, column l, paragraph 1 - column r, paragraph 2 * * page 296, column l, paragraph 2 * * table 2 * * page 298, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/ard.23.4.295