Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807897

EP2807897 - METHOD FOR USING A USER EQUIPMENT WITH A FIRST PUBLIC LAND MOBILE NETWORK AND WITH A SECOND PUBLIC LAND MOBILE NETWORK, USER EQUIPMENT, PROGRAM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deutsche Telekom AG
Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140
53113 Bonn / DE
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / KLATT, Axel
Feldhamsterstr. 30
50999 Köln / DE
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Schwöbel, Thilo K. , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Waidmarkt 11
50676 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Schwöbel, Thilo K. , et al
Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner
Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23
50668 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date12702752.223.01.2012
[2017/25]
WO2012EP00276
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110284
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807897
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807897
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04W88/06, // H04W68/00
[2017/02]
Former International [2014/49]H04W88/06
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES BENUTZERGERÄTS MIT EINEM ERSTEN ÖFFENTLICHEN LANDFUNKNETZ UND MIT EINEM ZWEITEN ÖFFENTLICHEN LANDFUNKNETZ, BENUTZERGERÄT, PROGRAMM UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT[2014/49]
English:METHOD FOR USING A USER EQUIPMENT WITH A FIRST PUBLIC LAND MOBILE NETWORK AND WITH A SECOND PUBLIC LAND MOBILE NETWORK, USER EQUIPMENT, PROGRAM AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT[2014/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR AVEC UN PREMIER ET UN SECOND RÉSEAU MOBILE TERRESTRE PUBLIC, ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR, PROGRAMME ET PRODUIT PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase25.08.2014National basic fee paid 
25.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
25.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
25.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2017Fee for grant paid
12.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.01.2017
Opposition(s)22.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
29.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
28.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
30.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
MC21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
IE23.01.2018
LU23.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
IE23.01.2018
LU23.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
LU23.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
LU23.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
LU23.01.2018
Former [2018/39]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SI21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
DK21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
SM21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
IS21.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT21.06.2017
CZ21.06.2017
EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RO21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
SK21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE21.06.2017
FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
LV21.06.2017
RS21.06.2017
SE21.06.2017
BG21.09.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI21.06.2017
HR21.06.2017
LT21.06.2017
NO21.09.2017
GR22.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2007275746  (BITRAN YIGAL [IL]) [Y] 1-14 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0126] *;
 [Y]WO2011056250  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * figures 5, 8-11 * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0063] *;
 [T]US2012051285  (HOU QINGZHU [CN]) [T] * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] *;
 [Y]CN101932097  (SPREADTRUM COMMUNICATIONS INC) [Y] 2,9;
 [Y]WO2007091245  (ALTAIR SEMICONDUCTOR LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 18, line 21 - page 22, line 9 *;
 [A]US2010202429  (CHIN TOM [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * figures 4, 7-10 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0082] *;
 [A]US2009131054  (ZHANG XUEJUN [CN]) [A] 1-14 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] *
by applicantUS2011217969