Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807774

EP2807774 - METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING TRANSMISSION OF DELAY SENSITIVE DATA IN A PACKET DATA COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.09.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2015/27]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (PUBL)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / SANDBERG, David
Näckrosvägen 28
S-169 37 Solna / SE
02 / LANGEREIS, Alexander
Germunds väg 30
S-193 40 Sigtuna / SE
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Bergenstråhle Group AB
P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Jacobsson, Peter
Bergenstråhle & Lindvall AB
P.O. Box 17704
118 93 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date12702905.623.01.2012
[2015/47]
WO2012SE50051
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013112078
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807774
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2807774
Date:18.11.2015
Language:EN
[2015/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER ÜBERTRAGUNG VON VERZÖGERUNGSEMPFINDLICHEN DATEN IN EINEM PAKETDATENKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ[2014/49]
English:METHOD AND ARRANGEMENT FOR CONTROLLING TRANSMISSION OF DELAY SENSITIVE DATA IN A PACKET DATA COMMUNICATION NETWORK[2014/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT DE RÉGULER LA TRANSMISSION DE DONNÉES SENSIBLES AU RETARD DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATION DE DONNÉES PAR PAQUETS[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2014National basic fee paid 
10.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
18.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.10.2015Fee for grant paid
02.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.06.2015
Opposition(s)19.08.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.01.2012
AL18.11.2015
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
TR18.11.2015
IE23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU23.01.2012
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
TR18.11.2015
IE23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2018/38]HU23.01.2012
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
BG18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2018/31]HU23.01.2012
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CY18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
MT31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU23.01.2012
AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MK18.11.2015
MT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2017/47]AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
MT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
IE23.01.2016
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT18.11.2015
BE18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
LU23.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SI18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
LU23.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/46]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
LU23.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
CH31.01.2016
LI31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/42]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
MC18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
LU23.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
DK18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
LU23.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/38]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
SM18.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
EE18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RO18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
SK18.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/34]AT18.11.2015
CZ18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/25]AT18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
LV18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT18.11.2015
ES18.11.2015
FI18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
PL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
BE31.01.2016
NO18.02.2016
GR19.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
PT18.03.2016
Former [2016/23]ES18.11.2015
HR18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
RS18.11.2015
SE18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
Former [2016/22]ES18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NL18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
IS18.03.2016
Former [2016/21]ES18.11.2015
IT18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
NO18.02.2016
Former [2016/20]ES18.11.2015
LT18.11.2015
Cited inInternational search[I]US2007183323  (HANNU HANS [SE] ET AL) [I] 1-23 * paragraphs [0032] - [0035] * * paragraphs [0075] - [0077] * * paragraphs [0101] - [0106] * * paragraphs [0120] - [0125] * * paragraphs [0129] - [0136] * * paragraphs [0138] - [0143] * * figures 4,5,8,10,12 *;
 [A]EP1126651  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraphs [0052] - [0054] * * paragraph [0060] *
by applicantWO2011025427