Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2672918

EP2672918 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PATIENT-SPECIFIC BRACKET BODY, AND ASSOCIATED BRACKET BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.04.2019
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DW LINGUAL SYSTEMS GMBH
Lindenstr. 44
49152 Bad Essen / DE
[2013/51]
Inventor(s)01 / VU, Hoang Viet-Ha Julius
Münchener Str. 6
59425 Unna / DE
02 / WIECHMANN, Dirk
Am Göslings Siek 4
49152 Bad Essen / DE
 [2013/51]
Representative(s)Taruttis, Stefan Georg
TARUTTIS Patentanwaltskanzlei Aegidientorplatz 2b
30159 Hannover / DE
[2013/51]
Application number, filing date12703112.808.02.2012
[2018/25]
WO2012EP52143
Priority number, dateDE2011100389409.02.2011         Original published format: DE102011003894
[2013/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012116877
Date:07.09.2012
Language:DE
[2012/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2672918
Date:18.12.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2012
[2013/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2672918
Date:20.06.2018
Language:DE
[2018/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61C7/14
[2013/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PATIENTENSPEZIFISCHEN BRACKETKÖRPERS UND ZUGEHÖRIGER BRACKETKÖRPER[2013/51]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PATIENT-SPECIFIC BRACKET BODY, AND ASSOCIATED BRACKET BODY[2013/51]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN CORPS DE BAGUE ORTHODONTIQUE SPÉCIFIQUE AU PATIENT ET CORPS DE BAGUE AINSI OBTENU[2013/51]
Entry into regional phase25.07.2013National basic fee paid 
25.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
25.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/51]
17.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.08.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.05.2018Fee for grant paid
08.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Appeal following examination08.12.2015Appeal received No.  J0001/16
08.12.2015Statement of grounds filed
21.06.2016Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2016/26]
25.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.12.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.07.2017
Opposition(s)21.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
21.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
07.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201403   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.2014
Stay/Interruption04.02.2015Stay of proceedings[2015/12]
03.07.2017Resumption of proceedings[2017/12]
04.02.2015Stay of proceedings[2017/12]
04.02.2015Stay of proceedings[2015/21]
01.07.2015Resumption of proceedings[2015/21]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ20.06.2018
DK20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SI20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/26]CZ20.06.2018
DK20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/12]CZ20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
SM20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/10]CZ20.06.2018
EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
RO20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
SK20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/09]EE20.06.2018
FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/08]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
IS20.10.2018
Former [2019/03]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
NL20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
Former [2018/52]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
GR21.09.2018
Former [2018/51]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
LV20.06.2018
RS20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
Former [2018/50]FI20.06.2018
HR20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
Former [2018/49]FI20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
SE20.06.2018
BG20.09.2018
NO20.09.2018
Former [2018/47]FI20.06.2018
LT20.06.2018
NO20.09.2018
Cited inInternational search[I]US2004175669  (ABELS NORBERT [DE], et al) [I] 1-12 * paragraphs [0041] - [0042] * * figure 5; claim 1 *;
 [XD]EP1941842  (T O P SERVICE FUER LINGUALTECH [DE]) [XD] 13 * claim 1 *
ExaminationUS2010003632
by applicantEP1474064
 US2002010568
 EP20070111572
 EP20080103240