Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2670346

EP2670346 - SYSTEMS FOR IMPLANTING AND USING A CONDUIT WITHIN A TISSUE WALL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Georgia Tech Research Corporation
505 10th Street NW
Atlanta, GA 30332-0415 / US
For all designated states
Emory University
1599 Clifton Rd., 4th Floor
Atlanta, GA 30322 / US
[2013/50]
Inventor(s)01 / JIMENEZ, Jorge, H.
195 14th Street NE
Apartment 2006
Atlanta, GA 30309 / US
02 / YOGANATHAN, Ajit, P.
3555 Castleridge Drive
Tucker, GA 30085 / US
03 / WEST, Seth
117 Honeysuckle Drive
Calhoun, GA 30701 / US
04 / THOURANI, Vinod
1210 Pine Ridge Road
Atlanta, GA 30324 / US
 [2013/50]
Representative(s)J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/50]Jackson, Martin Peter
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date12703407.201.02.2012
WO2012US23476
Priority number, dateUS201161438370P01.02.2011         Original published format: US 201161438370 P
US201161438415P01.02.2011         Original published format: US 201161438415 P
[2013/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2012106422
Date:09.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2670346
Date:11.12.2013
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2012
[2013/50]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/06, A61B17/11
[2013/50]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/50]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME ZUR IMPLANTIERUNG UND VERWENDUNG EINER LEITUNG IN EINER GEWEBEWAND[2013/50]
English:SYSTEMS FOR IMPLANTING AND USING A CONDUIT WITHIN A TISSUE WALL[2013/50]
French:SYSTÈMES D'IMPLANTATION ET D'UTILISATION D'UN CONDUIT DANS UNE PAROI TISSULAIRE[2013/50]
Entry into regional phase30.08.2013National basic fee paid 
30.08.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.08.2013Examination requested  [2013/50]
29.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.08.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[X]WO9965409  (ADVANCED BYPASS TECHNOLOGIES I [US]) [X] 1-5 * page 25, paragraph 2 - page 27, paragraph 3; figures 19a-19d *;
 [X]US2005171479  (HRUSKA CHRISTOPHER L [US], et al) [X] 6-14 * paragraph [0065]; figure 24 *;
 [A]US7846123  (VASSILIADES THOMAS A [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantUS2006089707
 US7846123