Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2675492

EP2675492 - USE OF A MEDICAL IMPLANT AS ADHESION BARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  24.11.2015
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
04.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gelita AG
Uferstraße 7
69412 Eberbach / DE
[2013/52]
Inventor(s)01 / OESSER, Steffen
Deichweg 17
24960 Glücksburg / DE
 [2013/52]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2013/52]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date12705109.216.02.2012
WO2012EP52702
Priority number, dateDE2011100423916.02.2011         Original published format: DE102011004239
[2013/52]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012110606
Date:23.08.2012
Language:DE
[2012/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2675492
Date:25.12.2013
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2012
[2013/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61L31/04, D01D5/00, D04H3/00, A61B17/00
[2013/52]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2013/52]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG EINES MEDIZINISCHEN IMPLANTATS ALS ADHÄSIONSBARRIERE[2013/52]
English:USE OF A MEDICAL IMPLANT AS ADHESION BARRIER[2013/52]
French:UTILISATION D'UN IMPLANT MÉDICAL COMME BARRIÈRE ANTI-ADHÉRENCES[2013/52]
Entry into regional phase26.07.2013National basic fee paid 
26.07.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/52]
21.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.07.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
02.11.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
03.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination13.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0854/17
13.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
29.10.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.07.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
23.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
26.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XDI]DE102007011606  (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE], et al) [XD] 1,2,4-6,9,11 * paragraphs [0003] , [0010] , [0040] , [0049] , [0085] , [0088] , [0089] , [0097] * [I] 3,10;
 [XI]DE102005054940  (GELITA AG [DE]) [X] 1,5,7,9-11 * paragraphs [0017] , [0031] - [0033] - [0047] , [0053] , [0054] , [0075] , [0076] , [0080] , [0081] * [I] 2;
 [XI]DE102007024220  (AESCULAP AG [DE]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0044] * [I] 2;
 [A]EP1920790  (GUNZE KK [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0006] , [0025] - [0027] *;
 [A]US2008069855  (BONUTTI PETER M [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] *
by applicantDE102007011606
 DE102004024635