EP2809680 - GPCR WITH IMPROVED CELL SUFACE EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/50] | GPCR WITH IMPROVED CELL SURFACE EXPRESSION | ||
[2016/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canvax Biotech, S.L. Parque Cientifico Tecnológico Rabanales 21 Calle Astrónoma Cecilia Payne 14014 Córdoba / ES | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAZ ROJAS, Elier C/ Alcalde Velasco Navarro 10 5ª Izq E-14004 Córdoba / ES | 02 /
GARCÍA MACEIRA, Fé Isabel C/ Alcalde Velasco Navarro 10 5ª Izq E-14004 Córdoba / ES | 03 /
LUNA GUERRERO, Verónica Inmaculada C/ Libertador Hidalgo y Costilla. Los Jardines 2 Bloque 11 4º C E-14013 Córdoba / ES | 04 /
MONTERO PEÑALVO, María Gracia C/ Historiador Manuel Salcines 6 4º A E-14004 Córdoba / ES | 05 /
GARCÍA MACEIRA, Tania C/ Miguel Benzo 16 3º C E-14004 Córdoba / ES | 06 /
MORALES MARTÍNEZ, José Andrés Plaza Arqueólogo Casas Morales 1 3 º 8 E-14004 Córdoba / ES | 07 /
ARAGÓN GÓMEZ, Ana Belén C/ Melilla 7 1 º 1 E-14010 Córdoba / ES | 08 /
QUESADA MOLINA, Ana Pasaje Escultor Benlliure 2 E-14010 Córdoba / ES | 09 /
MÁRQUEZ MORALES, Aurora María C/ Bartolomé Polo Raigón 4 Montilla E-14550 Córdoba / ES | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Illescas, Manuel Manuel Illescas y Asociados, S.L. (MIA) Principe de Vergara n° 197 Oficina 1°A 28002 Madrid / ES | [2014/50] | Application number, filing date | 12705809.7 | 31.01.2012 | [2016/24] | WO2012EP51532 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013113370 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2809680 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2809680 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/72, G01N33/74 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
C07K14/723 (EP,CN,US);
C07K7/08 (US);
G01N33/68 (US);
G01N33/74 (EP,CN,US);
C07K2319/035 (EP,CN,US);
C12N2710/16022 (US);
C12N2710/16222 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2333/726 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2500/00 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2500/10 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GPCR MIT VERBESSERTER EXPRESSION AN DER ZELLOBERFLÄCHE | [2016/01] | English: | GPCR WITH IMPROVED CELL SUFACE EXPRESSION | [2016/01] | French: | GPCR AVEC EXPRESSION AMELIOREE SUR LA SURFACE CELLULAIRE | [2016/01] |
Former [2014/50] | GPCR MIT VERBESSERTER ZELLOBERFLÄCHENEXPRESSION | ||
Former [2014/50] | GPCR WITH IMPROVED CELL SURFACE EXPRESSION | ||
Former [2014/50] | RCPG PRÉSENTANT UNE EXPRESSION À LA SURFACE CELLULAIRE AMÉLIORÉE | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 18.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 09.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.01.2012 | AL | 15.06.2016 | AT | 15.06.2016 | BE | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | CZ | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | MK | 15.06.2016 | NL | 15.06.2016 | PL | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | RS | 15.06.2016 | SE | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | SM | 15.06.2016 | TR | 15.06.2016 | NO | 15.09.2016 | GR | 16.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | CH | 31.01.2017 | IE | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | LU | 31.01.2017 | MT | 31.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 31.01.2012 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
MK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
MT | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 31.01.2012 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
MT | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HU | 31.01.2012 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
MT | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 31.01.2012 | |
AL | 15.06.2016 | ||
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
MT | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 15.06.2016 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
MT | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
MT | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
IE | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NO | 15.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | |
NO | 15.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2005202403 (FOWLKES DANA M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,11-13,15-19,21,22,25,27,28 * abstract * * paragraphs [0094] , [0097] , [0320] * [Y] 14 [I] 10,23,24,26,29; | [X]WO2006007857 (HVIDOVRE HOSPITAL [DK], et al) [X] 3,4,6,20 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2008048037 (HANMI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 14 * sequence 5 *; | [E]WO2012013204 (CANVAX BIOTECH SL [ES], et al) [E] 1-22,25-29 * page 32, line 27 - page 33, line 7; sequence 5 * * examples 8,9 ** claims 6,21-28,32,33 * |