Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2678720

EP2678720 - LIGHT COLLIMATOR AND LIGHTING UNIT COMPRISING SUCH LIGHT COLLIMATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.03.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PL
published on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Signify Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 48
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[2019/11]
Former [2018/50]For all designated states
Philips Lighting Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 48
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2016/34]For all designated states
Philips Lighting Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 45
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2014/01]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / PIJLMAN, Fetze
High Tech Campus 45
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / VISSENBERG, Michel Cornelis Josephus Marie
High Tech Campus 45
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2019/15]
Former [2014/01]01 / PIJLMAN, Fetze
High Tech Campus 34
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / VISSENBERG, Michel Cornelis Josephus Marie
High Tech Campus 34
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Representative(s)van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus , et al
Signify Netherlands B.V.
Intellectual Property
High Tech Campus 7
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2019/15]van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus , et al
Signify Holding B.V.
Intellectual Property
High Tech Campus 7
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2014/01]van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus
Philips
Intellectual Property & Standards
P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date12706707.220.02.2012
[2019/15]
WO2012IB50751
Priority number, dateEP2011015532122.02.2011         Original published format: EP 11155321
[2014/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012114248
Date:30.08.2012
Language:EN
[2012/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2678720
Date:01.01.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2012
[2014/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2678720
Date:10.04.2019
Language:EN
[2019/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.08.2012
ClassificationInternational:F21V8/00
[2018/36]
Former International [2014/01]G02B6/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:LICHTKOLLIMATOR UND LICHTEINHEIT ENTHALTEN EIN SOLCHE LICHTKOLLIMATOR[2018/36]
English:LIGHT COLLIMATOR AND LIGHTING UNIT COMPRISING SUCH LIGHT COLLIMATOR[2014/01]
French:COLLIMATEUR DE LUMIERE ET UNITE D'ECLAIRAGE COMPRENANT UN TEL COLLIMATEUR DE LUMIERE[2018/36]
Former [2014/01]LICHTKOLLIMATOR UND BELEUCHTUNGSEINHEIT MIT EINEM SOLCHEN KOLLIMATOR
Former [2014/01]COLLIMATEUR DE LUMIÈRE ET UNITÉ D'ÉCLAIRAGE L'INTÉGRANT
Entry into regional phase23.09.2013National basic fee paid 
23.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/01]
17.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.12.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.01.2019Fee for grant paid
18.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.07.2017
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
11.12.2017Request for further processing filed
11.12.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.12.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
02.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
PL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
[2019/52]
Former [2019/51]AL10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
BG10.07.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL10.04.2019
ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
HR10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
LV10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
RS10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
GR11.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/48]ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
SE10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
PT10.09.2019
Former [2019/47]ES10.04.2019
FI10.04.2019
LT10.04.2019
NL10.04.2019
NO10.07.2019
Former [2019/44]NL10.04.2019
Cited inInternational search[I]US2004105157  (MATSUSHITA MOTOHIKO [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * light collimator comprising an elongated waveguide with elongated cavities and a diffusive reflective layer adjacent to a waveguide surface; paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0106]; figures 1-27 *;
 [I]US2003227768  (HARA YASUSHI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * light collimator comprising an elongated waveguide with elongated cavities and a diffusive reflective layer adjacent to a waveguide surface; paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0065]; figures 1-5B *;
 [A]US2004141304  (NAGAKUBO HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * light collimator comprising an elongated waveguide with elongated cavities; paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0115]; figures 1-15 *;
 [A]US5890791  (SAITO SHINICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * light collimator comprising an elongated waveguide with elongated cavities; column 1, line 6 - column 11, line 48; figures 1-24 *;
 [A]JP2008235137  (NEC SEMICONDUCTORS KANSAI LTD) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantUS2008002421