Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2812761

EP2812761 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATED HANDLING OF A WORKFLOW IN AN AUTOMATION AND/OR ELECTRICAL ENGINEERING PROJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.09.2017
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB Schweiz AG
Brown Boveri Strasse 6
5400 Baden / CH
[2016/44]
Former [2014/51]For all designated states
ABB Technology AG
Affolternstrasse 44
8050 Zürich / CH
Inventor(s)01 / GUTERMUTH, Georg
Kaiserstrasse 1
69115 Heidelberg / DE
02 / RODRIGUEZ CARRION, Pablo
Im Mahrgrund 126
68459 Ilvesheim / DE
 [2014/51]
Representative(s)Marks, Frank , et al
ABB AG
GF-IP
Wallstadter Strasse 59
68526 Ladenburg / DE
[2016/46]
Former [2014/51]Kock, Ina
ABB AG
GF-IP
Wallstadter Straße 59
68526 Ladenburg / DE
Application number, filing date12707044.910.02.2012
[2016/46]
WO2012EP52300
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013117236
Date:15.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2812761
Date:17.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013
[2014/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2812761
Date:16.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:G05B19/042, G06Q10/06
[2014/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/51]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISIERTEN DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES WORKFLOWS IN EINEM AUTOMATISIERUNGS- UND/ODER ELEKTROTECHNISCHEN PROJEKT[2014/51]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR AUTOMATED HANDLING OF A WORKFLOW IN AN AUTOMATION AND/OR ELECTRICAL ENGINEERING PROJECT[2014/51]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION AUTOMATISÉE D'UN FLUX DE TRAVAIL DANS UN PROJET D'AUTOMATISATION ET/OU DE GÉNIE ÉLECTRIQUE[2014/51]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2014National basic fee paid 
30.06.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2014Examination requested  [2014/51]
11.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.10.2016Fee for grant paid
10.10.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
10.10.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.07.2016
Opposition(s)17.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.06.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU10.02.2012
AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CY16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE10.02.2017
LU10.02.2017
MT10.02.2017
BG16.02.2017
GB16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
[2019/47]
Former [2019/31]HU10.02.2012
AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE10.02.2017
LU10.02.2017
MT10.02.2017
BG16.02.2017
GB16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE10.02.2017
LU10.02.2017
MT10.02.2017
BG16.02.2017
GB16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
IE10.02.2017
LU10.02.2017
BG16.02.2017
GB16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2018/07]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
LU10.02.2017
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
FR28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2018/04]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
LU10.02.2017
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/51]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SI16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
CH28.02.2017
LI28.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/42]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
MC16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
BG16.02.2017
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
SM16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT16.11.2016
BE16.11.2016
CZ16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
EE16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RO16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
SK16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT16.11.2016
DK16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT16.11.2016
ES16.11.2016
FI16.11.2016
HR16.11.2016
LT16.11.2016
LV16.11.2016
NL16.11.2016
PL16.11.2016
RS16.11.2016
SE16.11.2016
NO16.02.2017
GR17.02.2017
BE28.02.2017
PT16.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV16.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[A]DE102007031693  (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *