Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2812761 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2812761



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 180
20.09.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
17.11.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
20.10.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
10.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.10.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
10.10.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
10.10.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 6
10.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
04.10.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
13.09.2016 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 23
19.08.2016 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
11.08.2016 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
28.07.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
28.07.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
28.07.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.07.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
28.07.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
12.07.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.03.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
11.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.03.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
11.03.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
11.03.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
11.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.11.2014 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.09.2014 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
15.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.09.2014 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.08.2014 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
30.06.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
30.06.2014 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
23.06.2014 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
13.12.2013 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
25.09.2013 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
25.09.2013 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
15.08.2013 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
15.08.2013 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 19
09.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
09.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
09.11.2012 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 3
10.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
10.02.2012 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
10.02.2012 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
10.02.2012 Description PCT receiving Office 12
10.02.2012 Drawings PCT receiving Office 3