Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2812761


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.12.2019 [2019/51]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019  [2019/47]
28.06.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  31.07.2019  [2019/31]
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
02.03.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.04.2018  [2018/14]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
12.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.02.2018  [2018/07]
22.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.01.2018  [2018/04]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
06.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.11.2017  [2017/45]
29.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
22.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
22.09.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.10.2017  [2017/43]
15.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.10.2017  [2017/42]
08.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
18.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.09.2017  [2017/38]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
14.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.08.2017  [2017/33]
07.07.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.08.2017  [2017/32]
30.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
16.06.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.07.2017  [2017/29]
26.05.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.06.2017  [2017/26]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
14.10.2016 (Expected) grant published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
12.10.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
12.10.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
11.10.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
30.09.2016 Change - applicant published on  02.11.2016  [2016/44]
17.08.2016 Change - representative
27.07.2016 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
25.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.04.2015 Change - extension states published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
12.03.2015 Amendment by applicant
26.02.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
14.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  17.12.2014  [2014/51]
15.08.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
24.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.07.2014 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
16.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
13.03.2012 PCT data prior to European publication