Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2681275

EP2681275 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING ZIEGLER-NATTA PRODUCED POLYETHYLENE BLENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.04.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
[2014/02]
Inventor(s)01 / DEWACHTER, Daan
Schansveld 12
B-2800 Mechelen / BE
02 / DAMME, Eric
Chaussée de Monstreux 7
B-7181 Arquennes / BE
 [2014/02]
Representative(s)Raboin, Jean-Christophe , et al
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
[2017/20]
Former [2014/02]Leyder, Francis
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Application number, filing date12708118.002.03.2012
[2017/20]
WO2012EP53654
Priority number, dateEP2011015705904.03.2011         Original published format: EP 11157059
[2014/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012119953
Date:13.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2681275
Date:08.01.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2012
[2014/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2681275
Date:17.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:C08L23/06, C08L23/08, C08F10/02
[2014/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYETHYLENMISCHUNGEN MIT ZIEGLER-NATTA[2014/02]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING ZIEGLER-NATTA PRODUCED POLYETHYLENE BLENDS[2014/02]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE MÉLANGES DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE PRODUITS AVEC UN CATALYSEUR ZIEGLER-NATTA[2014/02]
Entry into regional phase04.09.2013National basic fee paid 
04.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
04.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/02]
01.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.11.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.03.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
14.03.2017Fee for grant paid
14.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.04.2017Information about intention to grant a patent
11.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.11.2014
Opposition(s)20.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
30.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
27.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
[2018/52]
Former [2018/25]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SI17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
SK17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT17.05.2017
EE17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
LV17.05.2017
PL17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SE17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
LT17.05.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO0218461  (EQUISTAR CHEM LP [US]) [Y] 1-11 * example 4 *;
 [Y]EP1041113  (FINA RESEARCH [BE]) [Y] 1-11 * example 2; table 2 *;
 [Y]US5231151  (SPENCER LEE [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 32; table 2 *;
 [Y]EP0133383  (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [Y] 1-11 * page 5, line 37 - page 6, line 9 *;
 [A]  - malvern instruments, "mastersizer 2000", (20080117), URL: www.malver.co.uk/ms2000, (20110720), XP002652124 [A] 1-11 * page 6, paragraph 2 *
by applicantUS6930071
 US6864207