Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2681310


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018 [2018/52]
20.10.2018 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
20.06.2018 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.05.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.06.2018  [2018/25]
23.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
20.02.2018 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
09.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2018  [2018/11]
02.02.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2018  [2018/10]
26.01.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.02.2018  [2018/09]
01.12.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.01.2018  [2018/01]
24.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.12.2017  [2017/52]
17.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.12.2017  [2017/51]
10.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.12.2017  [2017/50]
03.11.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
29.09.2017 Opposition filed published on  01.11.2017  [2017/44]
07.04.2017 (Expected) grant published on  10.05.2017  [2017/19]
03.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
03.04.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
01.04.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
17.03.2017 Change - applicant
17.03.2017 Change - inventor
17.03.2017 Change - applicant published on  19.04.2017  [2017/16]
14.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.02.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
31.05.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee
31.05.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.05.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
05.05.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
02.03.2016 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
18.11.2015 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
06.11.2015 First examination report
02.04.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.05.2014 Change - extension states published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
26.03.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
25.03.2014 Amendment by applicant
06.12.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
06.12.2013 Request for examination filed published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
24.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
06.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
06.09.2013 Amendment by applicant
30.08.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
08.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
21.03.2012 PCT data prior to European publication