Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807707

EP2807707 - SLIM C5/C6 COUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.06.2016
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.07.2016  [2016/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Volex PLC
10 Eastbourne Terrace
Paddington, London W2 6LG / GB
[2014/49]
Inventor(s)01 / MO, YuanWen
Volex (Asia) Pte Ltd
35 Tampiness Street 92
Singapore 528880 / SG
02 / TOH, Mui Lian Jessica
Volex (Asia) Pte Ltd
35 Tampiness Street 92
Singapore 528880 / SG
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/49]
Application number, filing date12708729.426.01.2012
WO2012EP51207
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110333
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807707
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/648, H01R24/70, H01R103/00
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:SCHLANKER C5/C6-KOPPLER[2014/49]
English:SLIM C5/C6 COUPLER[2014/49]
French:COUPLEUR C5/C6 MINCE[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase26.08.2014National basic fee paid 
26.08.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
26.08.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.08.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.08.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
23.12.2015Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
05.02.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/28]
02.03.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2016/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2005020133  (HOMANN FRANK [DE] ET AL) [Y] 1-22 * figure 1A *;
 [Y]EP2194617  (ABB OY [FI]) [Y] 1-5,18,22 * figures 1A,3 *;
 [Y]US2009093160  (HSIEH SHIN-CHIH [TW] ET AL) [Y] 6-15 * figure 7 *;
 [Y]DE9105135U  (B.BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG) [Y] 6-15 * figure 14 *;
 [Y]EP1939992  (HOSIDEN CORP [JP]) [Y] 1,18,20,21 * paragraph [0018]; figures 4,8 *
 [Y]  - "IEC 60320-1 Appliance couplers for household and similar general purposes - Part 1: General requirements", INTERNATIONAL STANDARD - IEC; NORME INTERNATIONALE - CEI,, (20071101), vol. 60320-1, no. Ed. 2.1, page 115pp, XP009141157 [Y] 16,17,19 * pages 17,51-54 *