Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2807387

EP2807387 - ROLLING BEARING ASSEMBLY HAVING MAGNETIC AND/OR ELECTRONIC ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.01.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.01.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 07.02.2018  [2018/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aktiebolaget SKF
415 50 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]For all designated states
Aktiebolaget SKF
415 50 Göteborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / VERBE, Olivier
7 Rue Léonard de Vinci
F-37000 Tours / FR
02 / BERENS, Franck
Lieu Dit Grenet
F-37110 Saunay / FR
03 / CORDIER, Stéphane
24 Rue Jules Verne
F-37000 Tours / FR
 [2014/49]
Representative(s)Burö, Sven Peter , et al
SKF B.V.
Kelvinbaan 16
3439 MT Nieuwegein / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/49]Casalonga
Casalonga & Partners
Bayerstraße 71/73
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date12708736.926.01.2012
WO2012EP51253
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2013110334
Date:01.08.2013
Language:EN
[2013/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2807387
Date:03.12.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013
[2014/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:F16C19/16, F16C33/60, F16C41/00
[2014/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/49]
TitleGerman:WÄLZLAGERANORDNUNG MIT MAGNETISCHEN UND/ODER ELEKTRONISCHEN ELEMENTEN[2014/49]
English:ROLLING BEARING ASSEMBLY HAVING MAGNETIC AND/OR ELECTRONIC ELEMENTS[2014/49]
French:ENSEMBLE DE PALIER À ROULEMENT POSSÉDANT DES ÉLÉMENTS MAGNÉTIQUES ET/OU ÉLECTRONIQUES[2014/49]
Entry into regional phase21.07.2014National basic fee paid 
21.07.2014Designation fee(s) paid 
21.07.2014Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.07.2014Examination requested  [2014/49]
22.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/06]
04.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201706   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO2010127989  (SKF AB [SE]; CORDIER STEPHANE [FR]; LAPINTE JULIEN [FR]; LIVERATO YVES) [Y] 1-8,14 * page 4, line 23 - page 11, line 3; figure 1 *;
 [Y]WO2008138281  (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]; MASUR ERNST [DE]; RUEFF ETIENNE [DE]; RUOFF GOTTFR) [Y] 1-8,14 * abstract * * page 11, line 27 - page 12, line 5 *;
 [Y]US2010327686  (GARDELLE JEAN-LUC [FR] ET AL) [Y] 1,9-13 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0050]; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US5969518  (MERKLEIN HARALD [DE] ET AL) [Y] 1,9-13 * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 13; figure 1 *
by applicantFR2923277