Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2688506

EP2688506 - MECHANIZED SURGICAL EQUIPMENT COMPRISING AN INSTRUMENT AND AN INSTRUMENT HOLDER, CORRESPONDING PACKAGING AND INSTRUMENT HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.10.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.11.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  31.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, CH, LI
published on 20.03.2019  [2019/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Neolix
6 rue Léonard de Vinci
Maison de la Technopôle
53001 Laval / FR
[2014/05]
Inventor(s)01 / PERNOT, Jacques
21 Chemin de Merey
25870 Vieilley / FR
02 / EUVRARD, Hubert
6 Chemin des Essarts
Les Torcols
25000 Besancon / FR
03 / PAUL, Emilien
6 rue des Aiguisons
39700 Ranchot / FR
 [2017/49]
Former [2014/05]01 / PERNOT, Jacques
21 chemin de Merey
F-25870 Vieilley / FR
02 / EUVRARD, Hubert
6 chemin des Essarts
Les Torcols
F-25000 Besancon / FR
03 / PAUL, Emilien
6 rue des Aiguisons
F-39700 Ranchot / FR
Representative(s)Boüan du Chef du Bos, Louis-Paterne
Cabinet Bouan
34, rue de Bagneaux
45140 Saint Jean de la Ruelle / FR
[N/P]
Former [2017/49]Gicquel, Frédéric
Legi LC
4 impasse des Jades
CS 63818
44338 Nantes Cedex 3 / FR
Former [2014/15]Gicquel, Frédéric
Cabinet Legi LC
10, rue de Jérusalem
37000 Tours / FR
Former [2014/05]Bioret, Ludovic , et al
Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue de Jouanet - B.P. 90333 Technopole Atalante
35703 Rennes Cedex 07 / FR
Application number, filing date12709344.121.03.2012
[2017/49]
WO2012EP55028
Priority number, dateFR2011005228721.03.2011         Original published format: FR 1152287
[2014/05]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012126957
Date:27.09.2012
Language:FR
[2012/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2688506
Date:29.01.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2012
[2014/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2688506
Date:06.12.2017
Language:FR
[2017/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:A61C3/04, A61C8/00, A61B50/22, A61B50/30
[2017/33]
Former International [2014/05]A61C1/14, A61C3/04, A61C8/00, A61B19/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:MECHANISIERTE CHIRURGISCHE AUSRÜSTUNG MIT EINEM INSTRUMENT UND EINEM INSTRUMENTENHALTER, ENTSPRECHENDE VERPACKUNG UND INSTRUMENTENHALTER[2014/05]
English:MECHANIZED SURGICAL EQUIPMENT COMPRISING AN INSTRUMENT AND AN INSTRUMENT HOLDER, CORRESPONDING PACKAGING AND INSTRUMENT HOLDER[2014/05]
French:EQUIPEMENT MÉCANISÉ DE CHIRURGIE COMPRENANT UN INSTRUMENT ET UN PORTE INSTRUMENT, CONDITIONNEMENT ET PORTE INSTRUMENT CORRESPONDANTS[2014/05]
Entry into regional phase18.09.2013National basic fee paid 
18.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
18.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/05]
18.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2017Fee for grant paid
25.10.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.10.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.08.2017
Opposition(s)07.09.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
11.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
02.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
03.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
IE21.03.2018
LU21.03.2018
BE31.03.2018
CH31.03.2018
LI31.03.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
IE21.03.2018
LU21.03.2018
Former [2019/04]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
LU21.03.2018
Former [2018/52]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MC06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SI06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/51]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
DK06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/43]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
MT06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/40]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RO06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/39]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
IT06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/38]AT06.12.2017
CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/37]CZ06.12.2017
EE06.12.2017
ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
PL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
SK06.12.2017
SM06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/34]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
NL06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/24]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
LV06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
BG06.03.2018
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/23]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
HR06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
RS06.12.2017
SE06.12.2017
NO06.03.2018
GR07.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES06.12.2017
FI06.12.2017
LT06.12.2017
NO06.03.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]DE10146905  (BRASSELER GMBH & CO KG GEB [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figure - *;
 [A]EP1836991  (GALVAN MAURO [IT]; DELL AQUILA LUCA [IT]) [A] 1-12 * figure - *;
 [A]WO8805289  (IPCO CORP [US]) [A] 1-12 * figure - *;
 [A]DE2746313  (SCHNEIDER HANS KLAUS) [A] 1-12 * figure - *
by applicantEP2123233