Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2684045

EP2684045 - METHODS TO CHARACTERIZE PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM HEMOLYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.07.2015
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 21.11.2018  [2018/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris Cédex 13 / FR
For all designated states
Assistance Publique - Hôpitaux de Paris
3 Avenue Victoria
75004 Paris / FR
[2015/36]
Former [2014/03]For all designated states
INSERM (Institut National de la Santé et de la Recherche Médicale)
101, rue de Tolbiac
75013 Paris Cédex 13 / FR
For all designated states
Assistance Publique - Hôpitaux de Paris
3 Avenue Victoria
75004 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BLANC-BRUDE, Olivier
ParCC - Paris Center for Cardiovascular Research
Inserm UMRs 970
Hôpital Européen Georges Pompidou
56, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
02 / THARAUX, Pierre-Louis
ParCC - Paris Center for Cardiovascular Research
Inserm UMRs 970
Hôpital Européen Georges Pompidou
56, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
03 / BOULANGER, Chantal
ParCC - Paris Center for Cardiovascular Research
Inserm UMRs 970
Hôpital Européen Georges Pompidou
56, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
04 / LEJEUNE, Sylvain
Service de Médecine Interne et Hypertension
Artérielle
Hôpital Avicenne
125, rue de Stalingrad
93000 Bobigny / FR
05 / LIONNET, Francois
Service de Médecine Interne et Centre de référence
pour les Syndromes Hémolytiques
Hôpital Tenon
4, rue de la Chine
75020 Paris / FR
 [2014/03]
Representative(s)Nony
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/33]Jupin, Claude Christian Marie
Cabinet Nony
3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2014/03]Hirsch, Denise Marie
Inserm Transfert IP Department 7 rue Watt
75013 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date12710056.809.03.2012
[2015/36]
WO2012EP54153
Priority number, dateEP2011030525009.03.2011         Original published format: EP 11305250
EP2011030526110.03.2011         Original published format: EP 11305261
[2014/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012120130
Date:13.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2684045
Date:15.01.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2012
[2014/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2684045
Date:02.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/72
[2015/16]
Former International [2014/03]G01N33/50
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/03]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON PATIENTEN MIT HÄMOLYSE[2015/11]
English:METHODS TO CHARACTERIZE PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM HEMOLYSIS[2014/03]
French:MÉTHODES POUR CARACTÉRISER DES PATIENTS SOUFFRANT D'HÉMOLYSE[2015/16]
Former [2014/03]VERFAHREN ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON PATIENTEN MIT HÄMOLYSELEIDEN
Former [2014/03]MÉTHODES POUR CARACTÉRISER DES PATIENTS SOUFFANT D'HÉMOLYSE
Entry into regional phase05.09.2013National basic fee paid 
05.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
05.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/03]
18.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.07.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.04.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.07.2015Fee for grant paid
22.07.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.07.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.06.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  18.05.2016   
Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
 [2016/25]
12.07.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.01.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.01.2018Date of oral proceedings
18.04.2018Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.04.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition15.06.2018Appeal received No.  T1569/18
16.08.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU09.03.2012
AL02.09.2015
AT02.09.2015
BE02.09.2015
BG02.09.2015
CY02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MK02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
SM02.09.2015
TR02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
IE09.03.2016
LU09.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
[2018/47]
Former [2018/38]HU09.03.2012
AT02.09.2015
BE02.09.2015
BG02.09.2015
CY02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MK02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
SM02.09.2015
TR02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
IE09.03.2016
LU09.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
Former [2018/31]HU09.03.2012
AT02.09.2015
BE02.09.2015
CY02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MK02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
SM02.09.2015
TR02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
IE09.03.2016
LU09.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
MT31.03.2016
Former [2018/29]HU09.03.2012
AT02.09.2015
BE02.09.2015
CY02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MK02.09.2015
MT02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
SM02.09.2015
TR02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
IE09.03.2016
LU09.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2018/28]HU09.03.2012
AT02.09.2015
BE02.09.2015
CY02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
HR02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MK02.09.2015
MT02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
SM02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
IE09.03.2016
LU09.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/47]AT02.09.2015
BE02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
MT02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
IE09.03.2016
LU09.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/07]AT02.09.2015
BE02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
IE09.03.2016
LU09.03.2016
CH31.03.2016
LI31.03.2016
Former [2017/03]AT02.09.2015
BE02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
LU09.03.2016
Former [2016/49]AT02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
MC02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
LU09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/47]AT02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
LU09.03.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/39]AT02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
DK02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/36]AT02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SI02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
BE31.03.2016
Former [2016/24]AT02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
PT04.01.2016
Former [2016/23]AT02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RO02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
SK02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
Former [2016/22]AT02.09.2015
CZ02.09.2015
EE02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NL02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
IS02.01.2016
Former [2016/21]AT02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
IT02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2016/11]AT02.09.2015
ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2016/10]ES02.09.2015
FI02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
PL02.09.2015
RS02.09.2015
SE02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2016/09]FI02.09.2015
LT02.09.2015
LV02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
GR03.12.2015
Former [2016/08]LT02.09.2015
NO02.12.2015
Former [2016/07]LT02.09.2015
Cited inInternational search[Y]  - SHET ARUN S ET AL, "Sickle blood contains tissue factor-positive microparticles derived from endothelial cells and monocytes", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, (20031001), vol. 102, no. 7, doi:10.1182/BLOOD-2003-03-0693, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 2678 - 2683, XP002432340 [Y] 1-4 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2003-03-0693
 [Y]  - SIMAK JAN ET AL, "Elevated circulating endothelial membrane microparticles in paroxysmal nocturnal haemoglobinuria", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (20040601), vol. 125, no. 6, ISSN 0007-1048, pages 804 - 813, XP009158579 [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * page 812, column l, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2141.2004.04974.x
 [A]  - SABAA NATHALIE ET AL, "Endothelin receptor antagonism prevents hypoxia-induced mortality and morbidity in a mouse model of sickle-cell disease", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, US, vol. 118, no. 5, doi:10.1172/JCI33308, ISSN 0021-9738, (20080501), pages 1924 - 1933, (20080501), XP009158642 [A] 1-6 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI33308
 [Y]  - GAYEN BETAL S ET AL, "Phosphatidylserine-positive erythrocytes bind to immobilized and soluble thrombospondin-1 via its heparin-binding domain", TRANSLATIONAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 152, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.TRSL.2008.07.007, ISSN 1931-5244, (20081001), pages 165 - 177, (20080904), XP025532597 [Y] 5,6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.trsl.2008.07.007
 [A]  - DE FRANCESCHI LUCIA, "Pathophisiology of sickle cell disease and new drugs for the treatment", MEDITERRANEAN JOURNAL OF HEMATOLOGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASES, IT, (20090101), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 2035-3006, XP009158646 [A] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.4084/MJHID.2009.024
 [Y]  - VAN TITS L J ET AL, "Plasma annexin A5 and microparticle phosphatidylserine levels are elevated in sickle cell disease and increase further during painful crisis", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL COMMUNICATIONS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20091204), vol. 390, no. 1, ISSN 1090-2104, pages 161 - 164, XP009158576 [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2009.09.102
by applicantUS4816567
 US5225539
 US5585089
 US5693761
 US5693762
 US5859205
 WO9007861
 US5591669
 US5598369
 US5545806
 US5545807
 US6150584
 US5565332
 US5573905
 US5229275
 US5567610
 US6566135
 US6566131
 US6365354
 US6410323
 US6107091
 US6046321
 US5981732
 US6573099
 US6506559
 WO0136646
 WO9932619
 WO0168836
    - BOULANGER; DIGNAT-GEORGE, ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASC BIOL. 2011, (2011), vol. 31, pages 2 - 3
    - D. L. DRABKIN; J. H. AUSTIN, "Spectre/photometric Studies", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1935), vol. 112, page 51
    - KAHN SE; WATKINS BF; BERMES EW JR, ANN CLIN LAB SCI, (1981), vol. 11, pages 126 - 31
    - FAIRBANKS VF; WIESMER SC; O'BRIEN PC, CLI CHEM, (1992), vol. 38, pages 132 - 140
    - KUYPERS FA; LARKIN SK; EMEIS JJ; ALLISON AC, "Interaction of an annexin V homodimer (Diannexin) with phosphatidylserine on cell surfaces and consequent antithrombotic activity", THROMB HAEMOST, (200703), vol. 97, no. 3, pages 478 - 86, XP009123428
    - MURRY, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, INC., (1991), vol. 7
    - ALLAN, D.; LIMBRICK, A.R.; THOMAS, P.; WESTERMAN, M.P., "Release of spectrin-free spicules on reoxygenation of sickled erythrocytes", NATURE, (1982), vol. 295, pages 612 - 613
    - WARTH, J.A.; RUCKNAGEL, D.L., "Density ultracentrifugation of sickle cells during and after pain crisis: increased dense echinocytes in crisis", BLOOD, (1984), vol. 64, pages 507 - 515
    - CHABANEL, A.; REINHART, W.; CHIEN, S., "Increased resistance to membrane deformation of shape-transformed human red blood cells", BLOOD, (1987), vol. 69, pages 739 - 743
    - WUN, T.; PAGLIERONI, T.; TABLIN, F.; WELBORN, J.; NELSON, K.; CHEUNG, A., "Platelet activation and platelet-erythrocyte aggregates in patients with sickle cell anemia", J LAB CLIN MED, (1997), vol. 129, pages 507 - 516
    - SETTY, B.N.; KULKARNI, S.; RAO, A.K.; STUART, M.J., "Fetal hemoglobin in sickle cell disease: relationship to erythrocyte phosphatidylserine exposure and coagulation activation", BLOOD, (2000), vol. 96, pages 1119 - 1124
    - WESTERMAN, M.; PIZZEY, A.; HIRSCHMAN, J.; CERINO, M.; WEIL-WEINER, Y.; RAMOTAR, P.; EZE, A.; LAWRIE, A.; PURDY, G.; MACKIE, I. ET, "Microvesicles in haemoglobinopathies offer insights into mechanisms of hypercoagulability, haemolysis and the effects of therapy", BR J HAEMATOL, (2008), vol. 142, pages 126 - 135
    - SHET, A.S.; ARAS, O.; GUPTA, K.; HASS, M.J.; RAUSCH, D.J.; SABA, N.; KOOPMEINERS, L.; KEY, N.S.; HEBBEL, R.P., "Sickle blood contains tissue factor- positive microparticles derived from endothelial cells and monocytes", BLOOD, (2003), vol. 102, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2003-03-0693, pages 2678 - 2683, XP002432340

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2003-03-0693
    - VAN BEERS, E.J.; SCHAAP, M.C.; BERCKMANS, R.J.; NIEUWLAND, R.; STURK, A.; VAN DOORMAAL, F.F.; MEIJERS, J.C.; BIEMOND, B.J., "Circulating erythrocyte-derived microparticles are associated with coagulation activation in sickle cell disease", HAEMATOLOGICA, (2009), vol. 94, doi:doi:10.3324/haematol.2009.008938, pages 1513 - 1519, XP009158582

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3324/haematol.2009.008938
    - TRUDEL, M.; SAADANE, N.; GAREL, M.C.; BARDAKDJIAN-MICHAU, J.; BLOUQUIT, Y.; GUERQUIN-KERN, J.L.; ROUYER-FESSARD, P.; VIDAUD, D.; P, "Towards a transgenic mouse model of sickle cell disease: hemoglobin SAD", EMBO J, (1991), vol. 10, pages 3157 - 3165
    - BROWNE, P.V.; MOSHER, D.F.; STEINBERG, M.H.; HEBBEL, R.P., "Disturbance of plasma and platelet thrombospondin levels in sickle cell disease", AM J HEMATOL, (1996), vol. 51, pages 296 - 301
    - BEURLING-HARBURY, C.; SCHADE, S.G., "Platelet activation during pain crisis in sickle cell anemia patients", AM J HEMATOL, (1989), vol. 31, pages 237 - 241
    - BONNEFOY, A.; DAENENS, K.; FEYS, H.B.; DE VOS, R.; VANDERVOORT, P.; VERMYLEN, J.; LAWLER, J.; HOYLAERTS, M.F., "Thrombospondin-1 controls vascular platelet recruitment and thrombus adherence in mice by protecting (sub)endothelial VWF from cleavage by ADAMTS13", BLOOD, (2006), vol. 107, pages 955 - 964
    - BRITTAIN, H.A.; ECKMAN, J.R.; SWERLICK, R.A.; HOWARD, R.J.; WICK, T.M., "Thrombospondin from activated platelets promotes sickle erythrocyte adherence to human microvascular endothelium under physiologic flow: a potential role for platelet activation in sickle cell vaso-occlusion", BLOOD, (1993), vol. 81, pages 2137 - 2143
    - BRITTAIN, J.E.; MLINAR, K.J.; ANDERSON, C.S.; ORRINGER, E.P.; PARISE, L.V., "Integrin-associated protein is an adhesion receptor on sickle red blood cells for immobilized thrombospondin", BLOOD, (2001), vol. 97, pages 2159 - 2164
    - BRITTAIN, J.E.; MLINAR, K.J.; ANDERSON, C.S.; ORRINGER, E.P.; PARISE, L.V., "Activation of sickle red blood cell adhesion via integrin-associated protein/CD47- induced signal transduction", J CLIN INVEST, (2001), vol. 107, pages 1555 - 1562
    - BRITTAIN, J.E.; HAN, J.; ATAGA, K.I.; ORRINGER, E.P.; PARISE, L.V., "Mechanism of CD47-induced alpha4betal integrin activation and adhesion in sickle reticulocytes", J BIOL CHEM, (2004), vol. 279, pages 42393 - 42402
    - KOSFELD, M.D.; FRAZIER, W.A., "Identification of a new cell adhesion motif in two homologous peptides from the COOH-terminal cell binding domain of human thrombospondin", JBIOL CHEM, (1993), vol. 268, pages 8808 - 8814, XP002248146
    - BONNIN, P.; SABAA, N.; FLAMANT, M.; DEBBABI, H.; THARAUX, P.L., "Ultrasound imaging of renal vaso-occlusive events in transgenic sickle mice exposed to hypoxic stress", ULTRASOUND MED BIOL, (2008), vol. 34, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ultrasmedbio.2007.12.003, pages 1076 - 1084, XP022795618

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ultrasmedbio.2007.12.003
    - SABAA, N.; DE FRANCESCHI, L.; BONNIN, P.; CASTIER, Y.; MALPELI, G.; DEBBABI, H.; GALAUP, A.; MAIER-REDELSPERGER, M.; VANDERMEERSCH, "Endothelin receptor antagonism prevents hypoxia-induced mortality and morbidity in a mouse model of sickle-cell disease", J CLIN INVEST, (2008), vol. 118, doi:doi:10.1172/JCI33308, pages 1924 - 1933, XP009158642

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI33308
    - LEROYER, A.S.; EBRAHIMIAN, T.G.; COCHAIN, C.; RECALDE, A.; BLANC-BRUDE, O.; MEES, B.; VILAR, J.; TEDGUI, A.; LEVY, B.I.; CHIMINI,, "Microparticles from ischemic muscle promotes postnatal vasculogenesis", CIRCULATION, (2009), vol. 119, pages 2808 - 2817
    - LOUFRANI, L.; LEVY, B.I.; HENRION, D., "Defect in microvascular adaptation to chronic changes in blood flow in mice lacking the gene encoding for dystrophin", CIRC RES, (2002), vol. 91, pages 1183 - 1189
    - LIM, H.W.G.; WORTIS, M.; MUKHOPADHYAY, R., "Stomatocyte- discocyte-echinocyte sequence of the human red blood cell: evidence for the bilayer- couple hypothesis from membrane mechanics", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2002), vol. 99, doi:doi:10.1073/PNAS.202617299, pages 16766 - 16769, XP002508275

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.202617299
    - MUKHOPADHYAY, R.; LIM, H.W.G.; WORTIS, M., "Echinocyte shapes: bending, stretching, and shear determine spicule shape and spacing", BIOPHYS J, (2002), vol. 82, pages 1756 - 1772
    - VAN TITS, L.J.; VAN HEERDE, W.L.; LANDBURG, P.P.; BODERIE, M.J.; MUSKIET, F.A.; JACOBS, N.; DUITS, A.J.; SCHNOG, J.B., "Plasma annexin A5 and microparticle phosphatidylserine levels are elevated in sickle cell disease and increase further during painful crisis", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2009), vol. 390, doi:doi:10.1016/j.bbrc.2009.09.102, pages 161 - 164, XP026697006

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2009.09.102
    - MCLAUGHLIN, J.N.; MAZZONI, M.R.; CLEATOR, J.H.; EARLS, L.; PERDIGOTO, A.L.; BROOKS, J.D.; MULDOWNEY, J.A., 3RD; VAUGHAN, D.E.; HAM, "Thrombin modulates the expression of a set of genes including thrombospondin-1 in human microvascular endothelial cells", J BIOL CHEM, (2005), vol. 280, pages 22172 - 22180
    - PHELAN, M.W.; FORMAN, L.W.; PERRINE, S.P.; FALLER, D.V., "Hypoxia increases thrombospondin-1 transcript and protein in cultured endothelial cells", J LAB CLIN MED, (1998), vol. 132, pages 519 - 529
    - FRANGOGIANNIS, N.G.; REN, G.; DEWALD, O.; ZYMEK, P.; HAUDEK, S.; KOERTING, A.; WINKELMANN, K.; MICHAEL, L.H.; LAWLER, J.; ENTMAN,, "Critical role of endogenous thrombospondin-1 in preventing expansion of healing myocardial infarcts", CIRCULATION, (2005), vol. 111, pages 293 5 - 2942
    - SAJID, M.; HU, Z.; GUO, H.; LI, H.; STOUFFER, G.A., "Vascular expression of integrin-associated protein and thrombospondin increase after mechanical injury", J INVESTIG MED, (2001), vol. 49, pages 398 - 406
    - MCPHERSON, J.; SAGE, H.; BORNSTEIN, P., "Isolation and characterization of a glycoprotein secreted by aortic endothelial cells in culture. Apparent identity with platelet thrombospondin", JBIOL CHEM, (1981), vol. 256, pages 11330 - 11336
    - FREYBERG, M.A.; KAISER, D.; GRAF, R.; BUTTENBENDER, J.; FRIEDL, P., "Proatherogenic flow conditions initiate endothelial apoptosis via thrombospondin-1 and the integrin-associated protein", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2001), vol. 286, doi:doi:10.1006/bbrc.2001.5314, pages 141 - 149, XP002324346

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.2001.5314
    - MOURA, R.; TJWA, M.; VANDERVOORT, P.; CLUDTS, K.; HOYLAERTS, M.F., "Thrombospondin-1 activates medial smooth muscle cells and triggers neointima formation upon mouse carotid artery ligation", ARTERIOSCLER THROMB VASC BIOL, (2007), vol. 27, pages 2163 - 2169
    - DAWES, J.; CLEMETSON, K.J.; GOGSTAD, G.O.; MCGREGOR, J.; CLEZARDIN, P.; PROWSE, C.V.; PEPPER, D.S., "A radioimmunoassay for thrombospondin, used in a comparative study of thrombospondin, beta-thromboglobulin and platelet factor 4 in healthy volunteers", THROMB RES, (1983), vol. 29, doi:doi:10.1016/0049-3848(83)90212-8, pages 569 - 581, XP022877149

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0049-3848(83)90212-8
    - BONNEFOY, A.; MOURA, R.; HOYLAERTS, M.F., "The evolving role of thrombospondin-1 in hemostasis and vascular biology", CELL MOL LIFE SCI, (2008), vol. 65, pages 713 - 727, XP019583924
    - BRATOSIN, D.; ESTAQUIER, J.; PETIT, F.; ARNOULT, D.; QUATANNENS, B.; TISSIER, J.P.; SLOMIANNY, C.; SARTIAUX, C.; ALONSO, C.; HUART, "Programmed cell death in mature erythrocytes: a model for investigating death effector pathways operating in the absence of mitochondria", CELL DEATH DIFFER, (2001), vol. 8, pages 1143 - 1156
    - HEAD, D.J.; LEE, Z.E.; SWALLAH, M.M.; AVENT, N.D., "Ligation ofCD47 mediates phosphatidylserine expression on erythrocytes and a concomitant loss of viability in vitro", BR J HAEMATOL, (2005), vol. 130, pages 788 - 790
    - SAKTHIVEL, R.; FAROOQ, S.M.; KALAISELVI, P.; VARALAKSHMI, P., "Investigation on the early events of apoptosis in senescent erythrocytes with special emphasis on intracellular free calcium and loss of phospholipid asymmetry in chronic renal failure", CLIN CHIM ACTA, (2007), vol. 382, doi:doi:10.1016/j.cca.2007.02.044, pages 1 - 7, XP022095228

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cca.2007.02.044
    - IGLIC, A.; VERANIC, P.; JEZERNIK, K.; FOSNARIC, M.; KAMIN, B.; HAGERSTRAND, H.; KRALJ-IGLIC, V., "Spherocyte shape transformation and release of tubular nanovesicles in human erythrocytes", BIOELECTROCHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 62, pages 159 - 161
    - GAO, A.G.; LINDBERG, F.P.; FINN, M.B.; BLYSTONE, S.D.; BROWN, E.J.; FRAZIER, W.A., "Integrin-associated protein is a receptor for the C-terminal domain of thrombospondin", J BIOL CHEM, (1996), vol. 271, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.271.1.21, pages 21 - 24, XP002248145

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.1.21
    - MCDONALD, J.F.; DIMITRY, J.M.; FRAZIER, W.A., "An amyloid-like C-terminal domain of thrombospondin-1 displays CD47 agonist activity requiring both VVM motifs", BIOCHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 42, pages 10001 - 10011
    - ISENBERG, J.S.; RIDNOUR, L.A.; DIMITRY, J.; FRAZIER, W.A.; WINK, D.A.; ROBERTS, D.D., "CD47 is necessary for inhibition of nitric oxide-stimulated vascular cell responses by thrombospondin-1", J BIOL CHEM, (2006), vol. 281, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M605040200, pages 26069 - 26080, XP002483006

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M605040200
    - FLOQUET, N.; DEDIEU, S.; MARTINY, L.; DAUCHEZ, M.; PERAHIA, D., "Human thrombospondin's (TSP-1) C-terminal domain opens to interact with the CD-47 receptor: a molecular modeling study", ARCH BIOCHEM BIOPHYS, (2008), vol. 478, doi:doi:10.1016/j.abb.2008.07.015, pages 103 - 109, XP025408796

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.abb.2008.07.015
    - SCHWARTZ, M.A.; BROWN, E.J.; FAZELI, B., "A 50-kDa integrin-associated protein is required for integrin-regulated calcium entry in endothelial cells", J BIOL CHEM, (1993), vol. 268, pages 19931 - 19934, XP002312622
    - TSAO, P.W.; MOUSA, S.A., "Thrombospondin mediates calcium mobilization in fibroblasts via its Arg-Gly-Asp and carboxyl-terminal domains", J BIOL CHEM, (1995), vol. 270, pages 23747 - 23753
    - MATEO, V.; BROWN, E.J.; BIRON, G.; RUBIO, M.; FISCHER, A.; DEIST, F.L.; SARFATI, M., "Mechanisms of CD47-induced caspase-independent cell death in normal and leukemic cells: link between phosphatidylserine exposure and cytoskeleton organization", BLOOD, (2002), vol. 100, doi:doi:10.1182/blood-2001-12-0217, pages 2882 - 2890, XP055125010

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2001-12-0217
    - ROUE, G.; BITTON, N.; YUSTE, V.J.; MONTANGE, T.; RUBIO, M.; DESSAUGE, F.; DELETTRE, C.; MERLE-BERAL, H.; SARFATI, M.; SUSIN, S.A., "Mitochondrial dysfunction in CD47-mediated caspase-independent cell death: ROS production in the absence of cytochrome c and AIF release", BIOCHIMIE, (2003), vol. 85, pages 741 - 746
OppositionWO2004013303
    - WOOD et al., "Increased erythrocyte phosphatidylserine exposure in sickle cell disease: flow-cytometric measurement and clinical associations", Blood, (19960000), vol. 88, no. 5, pages 1873 - 1880, XP002491960
    - SETTY et al., "Role of erythrocyte phosphatidylserine in sickle red cell-endothelial adhesion", Blood, (20020000), vol. 99, no. 5, pages 1564 - 1571, XP055290058

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood.V99.5.1564
    - SHET et al., "Sickle blood contains tissue factor-positive microparticles derived from endothelial cells and monocytes", Blood, (20030000), vol. 102, no. 7, pages 2678 - 2683, XP002432340

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2003-03-0693