Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2695002

EP2695002 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHARACTERIZATION OF PHYSICAL PROPERTIES OF A TARGET VOLUME BY ELECTROMAGNETIC INSPECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.01.2016
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Université Catholique de Louvain
Place de l'Université 1
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[2014/07]
Inventor(s)01 / LAMBOT, Sébastien
avenue Fond Generet 39
B-1325 Dion-Valmont / BE
 [2014/07]
Representative(s)Pecher, Nicolas , et al
Abyoo sprl
Centre Monnet
Avenue Jean Monnet, 1
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
[N/P]
Former [2014/07]Denis, Samuel , et al
Pecher & de Groote sprl
Centre Monnet
Avenue Jean Monnet, 1
1348 Louvain-la-Neuve / BE
Application number, filing date12710735.727.03.2012
WO2012EP55416
Priority number, dateEP2011016091701.04.2011         Original published format: EP 11160917
[2014/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012130847
Date:04.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2695002
Date:12.02.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012
[2014/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2695002
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01V3/12
[2014/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR CHARAKTERISIERUNG DER PHYSIKALISCHEN EIGENSCHAFTEN EINES ZIELVOLUMENS DURCH ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE INSPEKTION[2014/07]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CHARACTERIZATION OF PHYSICAL PROPERTIES OF A TARGET VOLUME BY ELECTROMAGNETIC INSPECTION[2014/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CARACTÉRISATION DE PROPRIÉTÉS PHYSIQUES D'UN VOLUME CIBLE PAR INSPECTION ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE[2014/07]
Entry into regional phase30.10.2013National basic fee paid 
30.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
30.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/07]
29.09.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2015Fee for grant paid
29.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  29.09.2014
Opposition(s)14.12.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2016/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.03.2012
AL11.03.2015
AT11.03.2015
BG11.03.2015
CY11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
DK11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
MK11.03.2015
MT11.03.2015
PL11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
SM11.03.2015
TR11.03.2015
IE27.03.2015
LU27.03.2015
ES28.03.2015
NO30.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU27.03.2012
AT11.03.2015
BG11.03.2015
CY11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
DK11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
MK11.03.2015
MT11.03.2015
PL11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
SM11.03.2015
TR11.03.2015
IE27.03.2015
LU27.03.2015
ES28.03.2015
NO30.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2018/02]HU27.03.2012
AT11.03.2015
BG11.03.2015
CY11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
DK11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
MT11.03.2015
PL11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
SM11.03.2015
TR11.03.2015
IE27.03.2015
LU27.03.2015
ES28.03.2015
NO30.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2017/39]HU27.03.2012
AT11.03.2015
BG11.03.2015
CY11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
DK11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
MT11.03.2015
PL11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
SM11.03.2015
TR11.03.2015
IE27.03.2015
ES28.03.2015
NO30.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2017/03]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
DK11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
MT11.03.2015
PL11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
IE27.03.2015
ES28.03.2015
NO30.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2016/35]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
DK11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
PL11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
IE27.03.2015
ES28.03.2015
NO30.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2016/12]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
DK11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
PL11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
IE27.03.2015
NO30.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2016/08]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
DK11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
PL11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
IE27.03.2015
NO30.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2016/07]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
DK11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
PL11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
IE27.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2016/06]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
PL11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2015/51]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
PL11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2015/50]CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
PL11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
IS11.07.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
RO11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
PT13.07.2015
Former [2015/39]FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2015/37]FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2015/36]FI11.03.2015
HR11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
Former [2015/35]LT11.03.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]US5384715  (LYTTON ROBERT L [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 4, line 55 - line 68 *;
 [A]US2004155810  (WITTEN ALAN [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] *
 [A]  S. LAMBOT, F. ANDRÉ, K.Z. JADOON, E.C. SLOB, AND H. VEREECKEN, "Full-waveform modeling of ground-coupled GPRantennas for wave propagation in multilayeredmedia: the problem solved ?", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 13TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON GROUND PENETRATING RADAR, (20100602), pages 898 - 902, XP002658184 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * Equ. 1,3,4 * * Chapter 3: Near Field Model *
 [A]  SÉBASTIEN LAMBOT, EVERT C. SLOB, IDESBALD VAN DEN BOSCH, BENOIT STOCKBROECKX, AND MARNIK VANCLOOSTER, "Modeling of Ground-Penetrating Radar for AccurateCharacterization of Subsurface Electric Properties", IEEE TRANS. ON GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING, (20041111), vol. 42, no. 11, pages 2555 - 2568, XP002658185 [A] 1-10 * abstract * * Equ. 1 * * Equ. 14, Equ. 16-18 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/tgrs.2004.834800
by applicantWO03000403
    G. TOPP ET AL., "Electromagnetic determination of soil water content: Measurements in coaxial transmission lines", WATER RESOURCES RES., (1980), vol. 16, pages 574 - 582, XP009140155
    S LAMBOT ET AL., IEEE TRANS. ON GEOSCIENCE AND REMOTE SENSING, (200411), vol. 42, no. 11,
    "Full- waveform modeling of ground-coupled GPR antennas for wave propagation in multilayered media: the problem solved ?", S. LAMBOT ET AL., Proceedings of the 13th International Conference on Ground Penetrating Radar, pages 898 - 902,
    BARD, Y., Nonlinear Parameter Estimation, ACADEMIC PRESS,
    S. LAMBOT, "Estimating soil electric properties from monostatic ground-penetrating radar signal inversion in the frequency domain", WATER RESOURCES RES., (2004), vol. 40, page WO4 205,
    W. HUYER; A. NEUMAIER, "Global optimization by multilevel coordinate search", J. GLOB. OPT., (1999), vol. 14, pages 331 - 355,
    J. LAGARIAS, "Convergence properties of the Nelder-Mead simplex method in low dimensions", SIAM J. OPT., (1998), vol. 9, pages 112 - 147,
    S. LAMBOT, "A global multilevel coordinate search procedure for estimating the unsaturated soil hydraulic properties", WATER RESOURCES RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 38, no. 11, page 1224,
    LAMBOT, S.; SLOB, E.; VEREECKEN, H., "Fast evaluation of zero-offset Green's function for layered media with application to ground-penetrating radar", GEOPHYSICAL RESEARCH LETTERS, (2007), vol. 34, page L21405,
    S. LAMBOT, HYDROGEOPHYSICAL CHARACTERIZATION OF SOIL USING GROUND PENETRATING RADAR, (2003),
    S. LAMBOT ET AL., "Effect of soil roughness on the inversion of off-ground monostatic GPR signal for noninvasive quantification of soil properties", WATER RESOURCES RES., vol. 42,