Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2695095

EP2695095 - 3D IMAGE NAVIGATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  22.06.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
21.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AGFA NV
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[2018/44]
Former [2014/07]For all designated states
Agfa Healthcare
IP Department 3622
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
Inventor(s)01 / COSTA TEIXEIRA, Jose
Agfa HealthCare NV
IP Department 3622
Septestraat 27
B-2640 Mortsel / BE
 [2014/07]
Representative(s)Verbrugghe, Anne Marie L.
Agfa HealthCare
IP Department 3802
Septestraat 27
2640 Mortsel / BE
[2014/07]
Application number, filing date12711153.223.03.2012
WO2012EP55227
Priority number, dateEP2011016097404.04.2011         Original published format: EP 11160974
US201161471316P04.04.2011         Original published format: US 201161471316 P
[2014/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012136495
Date:11.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/41]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2695095
Date:12.02.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012
[2014/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2014/07]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/07]
TitleGerman:3D-BILDNAVIGATIONSVERFAHREN[2014/07]
English:3D IMAGE NAVIGATION METHOD[2014/07]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE NAVIGATION DANS UNE IMAGE EN 3D[2014/07]
Entry into regional phase04.11.2013National basic fee paid 
04.11.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
04.11.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.2013Examination requested  [2014/07]
23.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
28.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
28.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination27.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2672/17
22.11.2017Statement of grounds filed
15.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.01.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 06
03.04.2018Renewal fee patent year 07
01.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[I]  - TEISTLER M ET AL, "Simplifying the Exploration of Volumetric Images: Development of a 3D User Interface for the Radiologistâ s Workplace", JOURNAL OF DIGITAL IMAGING ; THE JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY FOR COMPUTER APPLICATIONS IN RADIOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20070327), vol. 21, no. 1, ISSN 1618-727X, pages S2 - S12, XP019637428 [I] 1-8 * abstract * * page S3, column l, paragraph l - page S7, column r, paragraph 1 * * page S10, column l, paragraph 2 - page S11, column l, paragraph l * * figures 1-5 *
 [ID]  - TEISTLER M, "Explore in 3D: a new virtual image navigation tool", SPIE newsroom, doi:10.117/2.1200607.0222, (20060807), URL: http://spie.org/x8741.xml, (20080201), XP002467328 [ID] 1-8 * the whole document *
 [A]  - LIDEN CR N M ET AL, "Alternative User Interface Devices for Improved Navigation of CT Datasets", JOURNAL OF DIGITAL IMAGING ; THE JOURNAL OF THE SOCIETY FOR COMPUTER APPLICATIONS IN RADIOLOGY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, NE, (20091201), vol. 24, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S10278-009-9252-2, ISSN 1618-727X, pages 126 - 134, XP019875732 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 126, column l, paragraph 1 - page 127, column l, paragraph 4 * * page 130, column l, paragraph l - page 134, column r, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10278-009-9252-2
 [A]  - SHERBONDY ANTHONY J ET AL, "Alternative input devices for efficient navigation of large CT angiography data sets.", RADIOLOGY FEB 2005 LNKD- PUBMED:15670996, (200502), vol. 234, no. 2, ISSN 0033-8419, pages 391 - 398, XP002657493 [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 392, column l, paragraph 3 - page 393, column m, paragraph 1 * * page 395, column l, paragraph l - page 398, column r, paragraph 1 * * figures 1,2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1148/RADIOL.2342032017