Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2694372

EP2694372 - AIRCRAFT PROVIDED WITH A SURVEILLANCE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.06.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Latecoere
135 Rue de Périole
31500 Toulouse / FR
[2014/07]
Inventor(s)01 / BOUCOURT, Gérard
8 rue de la Bergerie
31180 Rouffiac Tolosan / FR
02 / CARRIER, Xavier
19 Avenue St Exupery
31180 Rouffiac / FR
03 / GROUX, Laurent
5 Allee des Pinsons
31280 Mons / FR
 [2016/29]
Former [2014/07]01 / BOUCOURT, Gérard
8 rue de la Bergerie
F-31180 Rouffiac Tolosan / FR
02 / CARRIER, Xavier
19 Avenue St Exupery
F-31180 Rouffiac / FR
03 / GROUX, Laurent
5 Allee des Pinsons
F-31280 Mons / FR
Representative(s)Ipside
6, Impasse Michel Labrousse
31100 Toulouse / FR
[2016/29]
Former [2014/07]Ribeiro Dias, Alexandre
Schmit-Chrétien
Parc de Basso Cambo
4, rue Paul Mesplé
31100 Toulouse / FR
Application number, filing date12711418.902.04.2012
[2016/29]
WO2012EP55988
Priority number, dateFR2011005283201.04.2011         Original published format: FR 1152832
[2014/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012131101
Date:04.10.2012
Language:FR
[2012/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2694372
Date:12.02.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012
[2014/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2694372
Date:20.07.2016
Language:FR
[2016/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04N5/232, H04N7/18, B64D45/00, B64D47/08
[2016/08]
Former International [2014/07]B64D45/00, B64D47/08
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FLUGZEUG MIT EINEM ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM[2014/07]
English:AIRCRAFT PROVIDED WITH A SURVEILLANCE SYSTEM[2014/07]
French:AERONEF POURVU D'UN SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE[2014/07]
Entry into regional phase26.09.2013National basic fee paid 
26.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
26.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/07]
12.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.12.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.06.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.06.2016Fee for grant paid
13.06.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.06.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.12.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.04.2017  25.04.2017  ADMISSIBLE
AIRBUS Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
 [2017/22]
31.05.2017Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.10.2017Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.12.2018Date of oral proceedings
09.01.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.01.2019Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition08.03.2019Appeal received No.  T0715/19
09.05.2019Statement of grounds filed
03.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
28.04.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201403   M06   Fee paid on   02.05.2014
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.04.2012
AL20.07.2016
AT20.07.2016
CY20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MK20.07.2016
MT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
IE02.04.2017
LU02.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU02.04.2012
AL20.07.2016
AT20.07.2016
CY20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
IE02.04.2017
LU02.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2019/31]HU02.04.2012
AL20.07.2016
AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
IE02.04.2017
LU02.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/46]AL20.07.2016
AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
IE02.04.2017
LU02.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/43]AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
MT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
IE02.04.2017
LU02.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/23]AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
IE02.04.2017
LU02.04.2017
BE30.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/14]AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
LU02.04.2017
CH30.04.2017
LI30.04.2017
Former [2018/06]AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
MC20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SI20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2017/31]AT20.07.2016
CZ20.07.2016
DK20.07.2016
EE20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RO20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
SK20.07.2016
SM20.07.2016
BG20.10.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
LV20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT20.07.2016
ES20.07.2016
FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
NO20.10.2016
GR21.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
PT21.11.2016
Former [2017/10]FI20.07.2016
HR20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
PL20.07.2016
RS20.07.2016
SE20.07.2016
NO20.10.2016
IS20.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI20.07.2016
IT20.07.2016
LT20.07.2016
NL20.07.2016
NO20.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT20.07.2016
Cited inInternational search[I]US2005258943  (MIAN ZAHID F [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 9, paragraph 87 * * page 10, paragraph 94 - paragraph 95; figures 10-12 *;
 [I]US6831680  (KUMLER JAMES J [US]) [I] 1-15 * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 42; figures 3,4 *;
 [A]EP1419964  (L E A T S R L [IT]) [A] 1 * abstract *;
 [A]WO0199429  (WATKINS D SCOTT [US]) [A] 1 * page 21, line 7 - page 22, line 10; figure 10 *;
 [A]FR2856226  (ARMAND DANIEL [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2904506  (AIRBUS FRANCE SAS [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantFR2902592
OppositionUS2005258943
 US6831680
 US6915986
 DE10148054
 US2005116098
 US6766983
 EP1440883
 ES2223208
 BE759331
 WO9906275
 US2003117494
 WO9506303
 US6215519
 US6366311
 US2006268116
 US2003071743
 US2003094541
 US2006065782
 FR2902592
    - FOX, B., "Hidden cameras to monitor aircraft passengers", New Scientist, (20020508), XP055375842
    - SHARP, R., "Airbus A380 Quantas Implemantation Challenges", ANZSASI Regional Seminar, Maroochydore, Australia, (20030601), pages 1 - 45, XP055375854
    - AD AEROSPACE, "AD Aerospace Launches New Low Cost CDMS - 'CabinVu 123", AD Aerospace Pressemitteilung, (20050412), XP055375862
    - RAMSEY, J.W., "Eye on the Cabin", Avionics, (20130101), XP055375874
    - ADAMS, C. et al., "Cabin Security: Keeping Aircraft Safe", Avionics, (20011201), pages 1 - 10, XP055375881
    - "AIRBUS A300/A310/A320/A330/A340 COCKPIT DOOR SURVEILLANCE SYSTEM", Goodrich, (20060500), pages 1 - 2, XP055375893
    - "IN-FLIGHT VIDEO SECURITY SYSTEMS", Goodrich, (20030800), XP055375901
    - "Goodrich Video Surveillance Systems", Goodrich, (20030600), pages 1 - 4, XP055375910