EP2691376 - FE(III) COMPLEXES FOR THE TREATMENT AND PROPHYLAXIS OF IRON DEFICIENCY SYMPTOMS AND IRON DEFICIENCY ANAEMIAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vifor (International) AG Rechenstraße 37 9001 St. Gallen / CH | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARK, Thomas Viktoriastrasse 55 8050 Zürich / CH | 02 /
BUHR, Wilm Zum Kirchwald 20 78465 Konstanz / DE | 03 /
BURCKHARDT, Susanna Ackersteinstrasse 207 8049 Zürich / CH | 04 /
BURGERT, Michael Appenzellerstrasse 25 88045 Friedrichshafen / DE | 05 /
CANCLINI, Camillo Fichstestrasse 15 9000 St. Gallen / CH | 06 /
DÜRRENBERGER, Franz Dorneckstrasse 127 4143 Dornach / CH | 07 /
FUNK, Felix Römerstrasse 177b 8404 Winterthur / CH | 08 /
GEISSER, Peter Otto Marweesstrasse 8 9014 St. Gallen / CH | 09 /
KALOGERAKIS, Aris Kurzstrasse 1 8400 Winterthur / CH | 10 /
MAYER, Simona Egg 643 9055 Bühler / CH | 11 /
PHILIPP, Erik Schwalbenstrasse 1 9320 Arbon / CH | 12 /
REIM, Stefan Grundhofstrasse 68 8404 Winterthur / CH | 13 /
SIEBER, Diana Rossweidstrasse 3a 9030 Abtwil / CH | 14 /
SCHMITT, Jörg Heidlerstrasse 7 9425 Thal / CH | 15 /
SCHWARZ, Katrin Ringelbergstrasse 4 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | Gille Hrabal Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2014/06] | Gille Hrabal Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12711629.1 | 28.03.2012 | [2015/50] | WO2012EP55512 | Priority number, date | EP20110160151 | 29.03.2011 Original published format: EP 11160151 | [2014/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012130882 | Date: | 04.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2691376 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2691376 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/34, C07D239/80, A61P7/00, A61K31/26, A61K33/26, A61K31/513 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
C07D239/34 (EP,US);
C07F15/02 (KR);
A61K31/295 (KR);
A61K31/513 (EP,US);
A61K31/555 (EP,US);
A61K33/26 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
C07D239/46 (EP,US);
C07D239/47 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/26, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2014/06] | C07D239/34, C07D239/80, A61P7/00, A61K31/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FE(III)-KOMPLEXVERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG UND PROPHYLAXE VON EISENMANGELERSCHEINUNGEN UND EISENMANGELANÄMIEN | [2014/06] | English: | FE(III) COMPLEXES FOR THE TREATMENT AND PROPHYLAXIS OF IRON DEFICIENCY SYMPTOMS AND IRON DEFICIENCY ANAEMIAS | [2014/06] | French: | COMPOSÉS À BASE DE COMPLEXES DE FE(III) POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET LA PRÉVENTION DE CARENCES EN FER ET D'ANÉMIES DUES À UNE CARENCE EN FER | [2014/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.10.2013 | National basic fee paid | 18.10.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.10.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/06] | 11.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.10.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 20.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | HR | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | MK | 09.12.2015 | MT | 09.12.2015 | RS | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | SM | 09.12.2015 | IS | 09.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | BG | 09.12.2015 | |
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | CY | 09.12.2015 | |
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | EE | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | EE | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | EE | 09.12.2015 | |
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | IS | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | LT | 09.12.2015 | |
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 09.12.2015 | |
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 09.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP0138420 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) [AD] 1-18* abstract *; | [XA] - J OHKANDA ET AL, "N-Hydroxyamide-Containing Heterocycles. Part 2. Synthesis and Iron(III) Complex-Forming Tendency of 1-Hydroxy-2(1H)-pyrimidinone and -pyrazinone", BULLETIN OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (19930101), vol. 66, pages 841 - 847, XP055000884 [X] 9 * figure 3 * * table 3 * * page 846, column 2, paragraph 5 * * page 841, column 1, paragraph 1 * [A] 1-8,10-18 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/bcsj.66.841 | by applicant | US474670 | GB842637 | EP0107458 | EP0138420 | EP0150085 | EP0159194 | EP0308362 | JPH0283400 | ES2044777 | EP0939083 | US2003236224 | WO2004043786 | CN1687089 | WO2006037449 | WO2007062546 | WO2008145558 | US2009035385 | CN101481404 | - M.W. HENTZE, "Balancing acts: molecular control of mammalian iron metabolism", CELL, (2004), vol. 117, pages 285 - 297 | - BIOMETALS, (2009), vol. 22, pages 701 - 710 | - BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., page 66 | - REVIEWS ON HETEROATOM CHEMISTRY, (1998), vol. 18, pages 87 - 118 | - J. ORG. CHEM., (1997), vol. 62, pages 3618 - 3624 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1985), vol. 107, pages 6540 - 6546 | - INORGANICA CHIMICA ACTA, (1987), vol. 135, pages 145 - 150 | - TETRAHEDRON, (1967), vol. 23, pages 353 - 357 | - OHKANDA, BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (1993), vol. 66, page 841 | - CAN. J. CHEM., (1984), vol. 62, pages 1176 - 1180 | - E.E. ROYALS; K.C. BRANNOCK, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1953), vol. 75, pages 2050 - 2053 | - E.E.; K.C. BRANNOCK, J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1953), vol. 75, pages 2050 - 2053 | - M. YAMAGUCHI ET AL., J. LNORG. BIOCHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 100, pages 260 - 269 | - E.E. ROYALS; K.C. BRANNOCK, J. . CHEM. SOC., (1953), vol. 75, pages 2050 - 2053 | - M. YAMAGUCHI ET AL., J. INORG. BIOCHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 100, pages 260 - 269 | - YAMAGUCHI ET AL., J. LNORG. BIOCHEMISTRY, (2006), page 100 | - YAMAGUCHI ET AL., J. LNORG. BIOCHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 100, pages 260 - 269 |