Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2702129

EP2702129 - HARD SURFACE TREATMENT COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.11.2015
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4P 0DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/02]For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever N.V.
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4P 0DY / GB
Former [2014/10]For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CZ  DE  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GR  HR  HU  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
Unilever NV
Weena 455
3013 AL Rotterdam / NL
For:CY  GB  IE  MT 
Unilever PLC
100 Victoria Embankment
London, Greater London EC4P 0DY / GB
Inventor(s)01 / DAS, Somnath
Hindustan Unilever Limited
Research Centre
64 Main Road Whitefield
Bangalore 560 066 / IN
02 / DUTTA, Kingshuk
Hindustan Unilever Limited
Research Centre
64 Main Road Whitefield
Bangalore 560 066 / IN
03 / PRAMANIK, Amitava
Hindustan Unilever Limited
Research Centre
64 Main Road Whitefield
Bangalore 560 066 / IN
 [2014/10]
Representative(s)Fijnvandraat, Arnoldus
Unilever Patent Group
Bronland 14
6708 WH Wageningen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2014/28]Fijnvandraat, Arnoldus
Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Former [2014/10]Kan, Jacob Hendrik
Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
Application number, filing date12711656.403.04.2012
WO2012EP56036
Priority number, dateINMM1293201125.04.2011         Original published format: IN MM12932011
EP2011017033817.06.2011         Original published format: EP 11170338
INMM3274201122.11.2011         Original published format: IN MM32742011
[2014/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012146464
Date:01.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2702129
Date:05.03.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.11.2012
[2014/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2702129
Date:07.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/02, C11D3/37, C11D10/04, C11D3/04
[2014/10]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/10]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG HARTER OBERFLÄCHEN[2014/10]
English:HARD SURFACE TREATMENT COMPOSITION[2014/10]
French:COMPOSITION DE TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE DURE[2014/10]
Entry into regional phase08.10.2013National basic fee paid 
08.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/10]
31.10.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2014Fee for grant paid
24.11.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.11.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.10.2014
Opposition(s)08.10.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.04.2012
AL07.01.2015
AT07.01.2015
BE07.01.2015
CY07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
IT07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MK07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
NL07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
SM07.01.2015
IE03.04.2015
LU03.04.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
PT07.05.2015
[2018/46]
Former [2018/31]HU03.04.2012
AT07.01.2015
BE07.01.2015
CY07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
IT07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MK07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
NL07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
SM07.01.2015
IE03.04.2015
LU03.04.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
PT07.05.2015
Former [2017/39]HU03.04.2012
AT07.01.2015
BE07.01.2015
CY07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
IT07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
NL07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
SM07.01.2015
IE03.04.2015
LU03.04.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
PT07.05.2015
Former [2017/03]AT07.01.2015
BE07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
IT07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
MT07.01.2015
NL07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
IE03.04.2015
LU03.04.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2016/24]AT07.01.2015
BE07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
IT07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
NL07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
IE03.04.2015
LU03.04.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2016/20]AT07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
IT07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
NL07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
IE03.04.2015
LU03.04.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2016/12]AT07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
IT07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
NL07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SI07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
LU03.04.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2016/06]AT07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
IT07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
NL07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
LU03.04.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
CH30.04.2015
LI30.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2016/03]AT07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
IT07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
NL07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
LU03.04.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2016/01]AT07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
MC07.01.2015
NL07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
LU03.04.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2015/52]AT07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
NL07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
LU03.04.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2015/49]AT07.01.2015
CZ07.01.2015
DK07.01.2015
EE07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
NL07.01.2015
RO07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
SK07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2015/39]AT07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
LV07.01.2015
NL07.01.2015
RS07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2015/38]AT07.01.2015
FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
IS07.05.2015
Former [2015/37]FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
GR08.04.2015
Former [2015/36]FI07.01.2015
HR07.01.2015
LT07.01.2015
SE07.01.2015
BG07.04.2015
NO07.04.2015
Former [2015/35]LT07.01.2015
NO07.04.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]WO2010069731  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-9 * example -; claim - *;
 [A]WO2006083813  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 10, lines 21-25; example -; claim - *;
 [AD]WO2006108475  (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-9 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 12; example -; claim - *
by applicantWO0218531
 WO2006108475
 WO2010069731
 WO2004037944
 US5759983
 US5741760
 EP0225654
    - SCHWARTZ; PERRY, Surface Active Agents, INTERSCIENCE, (1949), vol. 1
    - SCHWARTZ; PERRY; BERCH, SURFACE ACTIVE AGENTS, INTERSCIENCE, (1958), vol. 2
    - McCutcheon's Emulsifiers and Detergents, MANUFACTURING CONFECTIONERS COMPANY