Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2681713

EP2681713 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ESTIMATING A SIMILARITY BETWEEN TWO BINARY IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  27.01.2017
Database last updated on 21.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.03.2017  [2017/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Université d'Aix Marseille
58 boulevard Charles Livon
13007 Marseille / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel-Ange
75016 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/02]For all designated states
Université d'Aix Marseille
58 boulevard Charles Livon
13007 Marseille / FR
For all designated states
Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique
3, rue Michel Ange
75016 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / MAVROMATIS, Constantin
31 boulevard de la Mazarade
F-13012 Marseille / FR
02 / PALMANN, Christophe
chez M.Jean-Marc SEARD
19 boulevard Lucien Bagnasco
F-13008 Marseille / FR
03 / SEQUEIRA, Jean
2822 RD 44E Lascours
F-13360 Roquevaire / FR
 [2015/02]
Former [2014/02]01 / MAVROMATIS, Constantin
31 boulevard de la Mazarade
F-13012 Marseille / FR
02 / PALMANN, Christophe
1 rue Germaine
Résidence Lavie
F-13014 Marseille / FR
03 / SEQUEIRA, Jean
2822 RD 44E Lascours
F-13360 Roquevaire / FR
Representative(s)Brun, Philippe Alexandre Georges
MED'iNVENT CONSULTING
Espace Mistral - Bât.A
297 avenue du Mistral
ZI ATHELIA IV
13705 La Ciotat Cedex / FR
[2014/02]
Application number, filing date12712313.102.03.2012
WO2012FR50438
Priority number, dateFR2011005171002.03.2011         Original published format: FR 1151710
[2014/02]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012117210
Date:07.09.2012
Language:FR
[2012/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2681713
Date:08.01.2014
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2012
[2014/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:G06T7/00
[2014/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ABSCHÄTZUNG EINER ÄHNLICHKEIT ZWISCHEN ZWEI BINÄREN BILDERN[2014/02]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ESTIMATING A SIMILARITY BETWEEN TWO BINARY IMAGES[2014/02]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR ESTIMER UNE SIMILARITÉ ENTRE DEUX IMAGES BINAIRES[2014/02]
Entry into regional phase02.10.2013National basic fee paid 
02.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
02.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/02]
30.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.10.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/09]
27.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2017/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201605   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]  - CHRISTOPHE PALMANN ET AL, "A new approach for registering remote sensing images from various modalities", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE, (20090101), doi:10.1117/12.830248, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 74770C - 74770C-11, XP055004186 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 6 * * page 5, line 34 - page 7, line 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.830248
 [Y]  - RAMTIN SHAMS ET AL, "Image Registration in Hough Space Using Gradient of Images", 9TH BIENNIAL CONFERENCE OF THE AUSTRALIAN PATTERN RECOGNITION SOCIETY ON DIGITAL IMAGE COMPUTING TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS (DICTA 2007), (20071201), doi:10.1109/DICTA.2007.4426800, ISBN 978-0-76-953067-3, pages 226 - 232, XP055004590 [Y] 1-14 * sections 1-3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DICTA.2007.4426800
 [A]  - RAMTIN SHAMS ET AL, "Gradient Intensity: A New Mutual Information-Based Registration Method", CVPR '07. IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION; 18-23 JUNE 2007; MINNEAPOLIS, MN, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070601), ISBN 978-1-4244-1179-5, pages 1 - 8, XP031114655 [A] 1-14 * sections 2-3 *
 [A]  - GOTTESFELD BROWN L, A SURVEY OF IMAGE REGISTRATION TECHNIQUES, ACM COMPUTING SURVEYS, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, US, PAGE(S) 325 - 376, (19921201), ISSN 0360-0300, XP002942558 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/146370.146374