blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2681713


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
27.01.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
26.10.2016 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.05.2016 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
27.03.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
05.12.2014 Change - inventor published on  07.01.2015  [2015/02]
09.05.2014 Change - extension states published on  11.06.2014  [2014/24]
02.05.2014 Amendment by applicant
03.04.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.12.2013 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
06.12.2013 Request for examination filed published on  08.01.2014  [2014/02]
29.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
11.10.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
24.09.2013 PCT data prior to European publication
21.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
08.09.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
08.08.2012 PCT data prior to European publication
17.04.2012 PCT data prior to European publication