blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2681713 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201280021376 EP12712313



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9171228Global Dossier 27.10.2015B2
US2014044362 13.02.2014A1
Priority number Date
FR1151710 02.03.2011
WO2012FR50438 02.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN103688289Global Dossier 26.03.2014A
Priority number Date
FR1151710 02.03.2011
WO2012FR50438 02.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2681713Global Dossier 08.01.2014A1
Priority number Date
FR1151710 02.03.2011
WO2012FR50438 02.03.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2012117210Global Dossier 07.09.2012A1
Priority number Date
FR1151710 02.03.2011
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
FR2972281 12.04.2013B1
FR2972281 07.09.2012A1
Priority number Date
FR1151710 02.03.2011