Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2695431

EP2695431 - PERFORMING A SELECTIVE IP TRAFFIC OFFLOAD PROCEDURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.09.2017
Database last updated on 28.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 18.12.2019  [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc.
200 Bellevue Parkway
Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
[2014/07]
Inventor(s)01 / KARAMPATSIS, Dimitrios
24 Shepherds Lane
Caversham Reading RG4 7JL / GB
02 / SHAHEEN, Kamel M.
429 Ashton Drive
King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US
03 / PATEL, Milan
8 Greville House
Lower Road
Harrow Middlesex HA2 0HB / GB
 [2014/07]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2016/44]Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
Former [2014/07]Johansson, Magnus
Awapatent AB
Box 1066
251 10 Helsingborg / SE
Application number, filing date12712511.029.03.2012
[2016/44]
WO2012US31162
Priority number, dateUS201161471022P01.04.2011         Original published format: US 201161471022 P
US201161501108P24.06.2011         Original published format: US 201161501108 P
US201161563026P22.11.2011         Original published format: US 201161563026 P
[2014/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012135467
Date:04.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2695431
Date:12.02.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012
[2014/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2695431
Date:02.11.2016
Language:EN
[2016/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:H04W36/12, H04W8/08, H04W36/00, H04W76/04, H04W84/04
[2016/19]
Former International [2014/07]H04W36/12
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/07]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:DURCHFÜHREN EINES SELEKTIVEN IP-TRAFFIC-OFFLOAD-VERFAHREN[2016/19]
English:PERFORMING A SELECTIVE IP TRAFFIC OFFLOAD PROCEDURE[2014/07]
French:RÉALISATION D'UNE PROCÉDURE SELECTIVE IP OFFLOAD TRAFIC[2016/19]
Former [2014/07]DURCHFÜHRUNG EINES SELEKTIVEN IP-VERKEHRSOFFLOADVERFAHRENS
Former [2014/07]MISE EN UVRE D'UNE PROCÉDURE DE DÉTOURNEMENT SÉLECTIF DE TRAFIC IP
Entry into regional phase28.10.2013National basic fee paid 
28.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.2012Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/07]
19.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.09.2016Fee for grant paid
14.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP16196547.0  / EP3171636
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.05.2015
Opposition(s)03.08.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
24.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
23.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.03.2012
AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CY02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
MK02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE29.03.2017
LU29.03.2017
MT29.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
[2019/51]
Former [2019/46]HU29.03.2012
AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CY02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE29.03.2017
LU29.03.2017
MT29.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2019/31]HU29.03.2012
AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE29.03.2017
LU29.03.2017
MT29.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/43]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE29.03.2017
LU29.03.2017
MT29.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/13]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
IE29.03.2017
LU29.03.2017
CH31.03.2017
LI31.03.2017
Former [2018/10]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
LU29.03.2017
Former [2017/52]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
MC02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SI02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/38]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
BG02.02.2017
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/37]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
IT02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
SM02.11.2016
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/36]AT02.11.2016
BE02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
EE02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RO02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
SK02.11.2016
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/34]AT02.11.2016
CZ02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/33]AT02.11.2016
DK02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/26]AT02.11.2016
ES02.11.2016
FI02.11.2016
HR02.11.2016
LT02.11.2016
LV02.11.2016
PL02.11.2016
RS02.11.2016
SE02.11.2016
GR03.02.2017
IS02.03.2017
PT02.03.2017
Former [2017/12]LV02.11.2016
Cited inInternational search[X]GB2472866  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-20 * page 1, line 28 - page 4, line 20 * * page 6, line 11 - page 8, line 14 * * claims 1-37 *;
 [X]WO2011034173  (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 US2011286430  [ ] (ZEMBUTSU HAJIME [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0035] *;
 [A]  - JAEHOON ROH ET AL, "Femtocell Traffic Offload Scheme for Core Networks", NEW TECHNOLOGIES, MOBILITY AND SECURITY (NTMS), 2011 4TH IFIP INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20110207), doi:10.1109/NTMS.2011.5721037, ISBN 978-1-4244-8705-9, pages 1 - 5, XP031982275 [A] 1-20 * page 2, paragraph III - page 4, paragraph V *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NTMS.2011.5721037