EP2693885 - SYNERGISTIC ANTIMICROBIAL EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chr. Hansen A/S Bøge Allé 10-12 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2014/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORNBAEK, Tina Mosevangen 42 DK-3460 Birkeroed / DK | 02 /
LISBERG, Maike Ny Strandvej 21 DK-3060 Espergaerde / DK | 03 /
DIEMER, Silja Kej Priorvej 8, 1. th DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK | [2018/10] |
Former [2014/07] | 01 /
HORNBAEK, Tina Mosevangen 42 DK-3460 Birkeroed / DK | ||
02 /
LISBERG, Maike Ny Strandvej 21 DK-3060 Espergaerde / DK | |||
03 /
DIEMER, Silja Kej Priorvej 8 1. th DK-2000 Frederiksberg / DK | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2018/10] |
Former [2014/07] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 12712665.4 | 09.04.2012 | [2018/10] | WO2012EP56384 | Priority number, date | EP20110161609 | 08.04.2011 Original published format: EP 11161609 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012136830 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2693885 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2693885 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/00, A01P1/00, A01P3/00 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
A01N63/20 (EP,US);
A61K35/74 (KR);
A01N63/00 (US);
A23C9/1234 (US);
A61K35/747 (US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
C12N1/205 (US);
C12R2001/225 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N63/00, A01N2300/00 (US);
A01N63/00, A01N63/00 (US);
A01N63/20, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N63/20, A01N63/20 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNERGISTISCHER ANTIMIKROBIELLER EFFEKT | [2017/45] | English: | SYNERGISTIC ANTIMICROBIAL EFFECT | [2014/07] | French: | EFFET ANTIMICROBIEN SYNERGETIQUE | [2017/45] |
Former [2014/07] | SYNERGISTISCHE ANTIMIKROBIELLE WIRKUNG | ||
Former [2014/07] | EFFET ANTIMICROBIEN SYNERGIQUE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2013 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 26.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 07.03.2018 | CY | 07.03.2018 | EE | 07.03.2018 | HR | 07.03.2018 | LT | 07.03.2018 | LV | 07.03.2018 | MC | 07.03.2018 | MK | 07.03.2018 | RS | 07.03.2018 | SI | 07.03.2018 | SK | 07.03.2018 | SM | 07.03.2018 | LU | 09.04.2018 | MT | 09.04.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.04.2018 | ||
MT | 09.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SI | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
MC | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
SM | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
EE | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
SK | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 07.03.2018 | |
CY | 07.03.2018 | ||
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | ||
LV | 07.03.2018 | ||
RS | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 07.03.2018 | |
HR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LT | 07.03.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0852114 (COBIOTEX [FR]) [X] 1,6* examples 1,9,11; claim 14 *; | [Y]US2008107699 (SPIGELMAN MARK [US], et al) [Y] 6,7 * claims 1,9 *; | [Y]WO2009098411 (GERVAIS DANONE SA [FR], et al) [Y] 6,7 * claim 1 * | by applicant | WO2004041305 | US2005095318 | - THARMARAJ, N.; SHAH, N.P., "Antimicrobial effects of probiotic bacteria against selected species of yeasts and molds in cheese-based dips", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, (2009), vol. 44, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1365-2621.2009.01986.x, pages 1916 - 1926, XP055036827 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.2009.01986.x |