EP2695502 - POWER SWITCHGEAR CABINET OF A DEVICE FOR PRODUCING ELECTRIC ENERGY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConverterTec Deutschland GmbH Krefelder Weg 47 47906 Kempen / DE | [2021/11] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Woodward Kempen GmbH Krefelder Weg 47 47906 Kempen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EICHLER, Markus Ahornstrasse 23 79761 Waldshut-Tiengen / DE | 02 /
NOWAK, Hans-Georg Dohrer Straße 443 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | 03 /
HITPAß, Marianne Uerdingerstraße 272 47800 Krefeld / DE | [2022/19] |
Former [2014/07] | 01 /
EICHLER, Markus Marienburgstraße 1 47906 Kempen / DE | ||
02 /
NOWAK, Hans-Georg Dohrer Straße 443 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | |||
03 /
HITPAß, Marianne Uerdingerstraße 272 47800 Krefeld / DE | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/11] |
Former [2014/07] | Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12713713.1 | 04.04.2012 | [2016/11] | WO2012EP56220 | Priority number, date | DE20111001786 | 04.04.2011 Original published format: DE102011001786 | [2014/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012136727 | Date: | 11.10.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2695502 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2695502 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/11] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2695502 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14, H02M7/00, F03D9/00, H02J3/38 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
F03D9/25 (EP,US);
F03D80/82 (EP,US);
F03D9/257 (EP,US);
H02B1/32 (US);
H02B1/565 (US);
H02B13/02 (US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H05K7/1432 (US);
H05K7/14325 (EP);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
H02M7/003 (EP,US);
H02M7/493 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/07] | Title | German: | LEISTUNGSSCHALTSCHRANK EINER VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG ELEKTRISCHER ENERGIE | [2014/07] | English: | POWER SWITCHGEAR CABINET OF A DEVICE FOR PRODUCING ELECTRIC ENERGY | [2014/07] | French: | ARMOIRE DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'ÉLECTRICITÉ | [2014/07] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2013 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2013 | Examination requested [2014/07] | 02.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.12.2016
Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/04] | 15.02.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.06.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.08.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.08.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.12.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.03.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.06.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 16.10.2018 | Appeal received No. T2565/18 | 17.12.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.12.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 10.12.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2012 | AL | 16.03.2016 | CY | 16.03.2016 | CZ | 16.03.2016 | DK | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | ES | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | HR | 16.03.2016 | IT | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | MK | 16.03.2016 | MT | 16.03.2016 | NL | 16.03.2016 | PL | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | RS | 16.03.2016 | SE | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | SM | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | IE | 04.04.2016 | LU | 04.04.2016 | BE | 30.04.2016 | CH | 30.04.2016 | LI | 30.04.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | NO | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | AT | 04.04.2017 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/40] | HU | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
MT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
AT | 04.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
MT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
LU | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 04.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
CH | 30.04.2016 | ||
LI | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 30.04.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [AD]EP1903848 (ABB OY [FI]) [AD] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0012]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2010108928 (GE WIND ENERGY NORWAY AS [NO], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]US7859838 (PESONEN SAMI [FI]) [AD] 1-17* column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 63; figures 1a-5 * | by applicant | EP1903848 | US7859838 | Opposition | WO03065567 | EP1802189 | WO2007115951 | DE102006050289 | WO2010089006 | EP1903848 | DE102009013311 | CN201742105U | EP2463996 | - "Frequency Changer", wikipedia, XP055336532 | - "Chopper (electronics", Wikipedia, (19960000), XP055336541 | - "List of offshore wind farms", wikipedia, (20160000), XP055336554 | - "Schaltschrank", wikipedia, (19820000), XP055336559 | - "Frequency Changer", wikipedia | - Wikipedia Auszug mit dem Titel "Schaltplan", mit dem letzten Bearbeitungsdatum 12.04.2017 | - Handbuch Stromrichter, AEG-Telefunken, ISBN 0-387-08563-7, 29.Auflage, Seiten 81-85/101-102), 178 (siehe https://www.av-huette.de/chronik_buecher.html) | - Wikipedia Auszug mit dem Titel "Frequency changer", 04 05 2010 | - Wikipedia Auszug mil dem Titel "Chopper (electronics)". Revision as of 27.02.2011 | - Hardware Manual ACx 6x7 units, ABB | - Ausdruck einer Suchanfrage im Download Center von ABB fur Frequenzumrichter and Stromumrichter, dem ein Veröffentlichungsdatum der D14 vom 16.5.2003 zu entnehmen ist | - "General considerations for IGBT and intelligent power modules", Mitsubishi Semiconductors Power Modules MOS, die Angabe Sep. 1998 befindet sich im unteren Teil der Seiten | - Fuji IGBT modules application manual, Fuji Electric Device Technology Co.,Ltd ; die Angabe February 2004, REH984 befindet sich auf der ersten Seite | - Ausdruck einer Suchanfrage mittels der "wayback machine", zum Nachweis der Verfügbarkeit der DE16 vor dem Prioritätsdatum des Streitpatents | - Application Note AN-8005, Semikron, issue date 24.09 2008 |