Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2688832

EP2688832 - A DEVICE FOR TIGHTENING ROPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.07.2018
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip09.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT, RO, SE
published on 12.12.2018  [2018/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flamek Ltd
Reiten 49
6060 Hareid / NO
[2014/05]
Inventor(s)01 / SANDVIK, Karl Fredrik
FlaMek Ltd Reiten 49
NO-6060 Hareid / NO
 [2014/05]
Representative(s)Oslo Patentkontor AS
P.O. Box 7007M
0306 Oslo / NO
[2014/05]
Application number, filing date12714090.323.03.2012
WO2012NO00031
Priority number, dateNO2011000043623.03.2011         Original published format: NO 20110436
[2014/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012128637
Date:27.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/39]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2688832
Date:29.01.2014
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2012
[2014/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2688832
Date:11.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.09.2012
ClassificationInternational:B66D1/74, B66D1/50, B66D1/52
[2014/45]
Former International [2014/05]B66D1/74
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/05]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPANNEN EINES SEILS[2014/05]
English:A DEVICE FOR TIGHTENING ROPE[2014/05]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR SERRER UNE CORDE[2014/05]
Entry into regional phase07.09.2013National basic fee paid 
07.09.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
07.09.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.09.2013Examination requested  [2014/05]
16.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2015Fee for grant paid
28.01.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.01.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.12.2014
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.12.2015   
Rolls-Royce Marine AS
P.O.B. 193
6069 Hareid / NO
Opponent's representative
Øvsttun, Trond, et al
ACAPO AS Postboks 1880 Nordnes
5817 Bergen / NO
 [2016/03]
14.01.2016Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.05.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.03.2018Date of oral proceedings
08.06.2018Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
08.06.2018Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition15.08.2018Appeal received No.  T2092/18
12.10.2018Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.03.2012
AL11.03.2015
AT11.03.2015
BE11.03.2015
BG11.03.2015
CY11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
IT11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
MK11.03.2015
MT11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
SM11.03.2015
TR11.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
RO23.03.2018
SE24.03.2018
PT24.09.2018
[2018/49]
Former [2018/46]HU23.03.2012
AL11.03.2015
AT11.03.2015
BE11.03.2015
BG11.03.2015
CY11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
IT11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
MK11.03.2015
MT11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
SM11.03.2015
TR11.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2018/31]HU23.03.2012
AT11.03.2015
BE11.03.2015
BG11.03.2015
CY11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
IT11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
MK11.03.2015
MT11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
SM11.03.2015
TR11.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2018/02]HU23.03.2012
AT11.03.2015
BE11.03.2015
BG11.03.2015
CY11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
IT11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
MT11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
SM11.03.2015
TR11.03.2015
LU23.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2017/39]HU23.03.2012
AT11.03.2015
BE11.03.2015
BG11.03.2015
CY11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
IT11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
MT11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
SM11.03.2015
TR11.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2017/03]AT11.03.2015
BE11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
IT11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
MT11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2016/37]AT11.03.2015
BE11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
IT11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2016/12]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
IT11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SI11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2016/06]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
IT11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
MC11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
CH31.03.2015
LI31.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2016/03]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
IT11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2015/51]AT11.03.2015
CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2015/49]CZ11.03.2015
EE11.03.2015
FI11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
SK11.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2015/39]FI11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
LV11.03.2015
RS11.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2015/37]FI11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
GR12.06.2015
Former [2015/36]FI11.03.2015
LT11.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
Former [2015/35]LT11.03.2015
NO11.06.2015
Cited inInternational search[A]DE1107311  (TELEGRAPH CONSTR & MAINTENANCE) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7134645  (JOHNSON ERIC ARTHUR [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO8303814  (MURDOCK MACHINE & ENG [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR448630  (SOCIETE VERNES GUINET SIGROS & CIE [FR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2011139160
OppositionUS2756872
 DE1107311
 WO2010097426
 US4760992
 US5906325
 US2010224844
 US2008224111
 US3246818
 US2791910
 US4065101
 WO2011089479
 WO2011139160
 NO309646B
 US6182915