Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2691782

EP2691782 - CURRENT SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.01.2017  [2017/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Continental Teves AG & Co. OHG
Guerickestrasse 7
60488 Frankfurt / DE
[2014/06]
Inventor(s)01 / JÖCKEL, Wolfgang
Egon-Langheinrich-Straße 7
36129 Gersfeld / DE
02 / RINK, Klaus
Meisenweg 3
63517 Rodenbach / DE
 [2014/06]
Representative(s)Höer, Daniela
Continental Teves AG & Co. oHG
Guerickestraße 7
60488 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2014/06]
Application number, filing date12714274.329.03.2012
WO2012EP55718
Priority number, dateDE2011100637629.03.2011         Original published format: DE102011006376
[2014/06]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2012130995
Date:04.10.2012
Language:DE
[2012/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2691782
Date:05.02.2014
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2012
[2014/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01R19/00, G01R1/20, G01R15/00, G01R15/20, H03M1/12
[2014/06]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/06]
TitleGerman:STROMSENSOR[2014/06]
English:CURRENT SENSOR[2014/06]
French:CAPTEUR DE COURANT[2014/06]
Entry into regional phase29.10.2013National basic fee paid 
29.10.2013Designation fee(s) paid 
29.10.2013Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.10.2013Examination requested  [2014/06]
22.05.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.02.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.08.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/01]
30.08.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/01]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.02.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 04
31.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2008071722  (SIEMENS AG [DE]; MAIER REINHARD [DE]; MITLEHNER HEINZ [DE]; RUPP JUERG) [X] 1-3,6,9-13 * figures 1,2,3,7,9 * * page 1, line 5 - page 2, line 3 * * page 2, line 24 - page 5, line 34 * * page 7, line 16 - page 8, line 17 * * page 8, line 33 - page 10, line 11 * [I] 4,5,7,8,14,15;
 [XI]EP2068158  (DIEHL AEROSPACE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4 * figures 1,2,3 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0016] , [0028] , [0020] , [0021] , [0024] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraphs [0037] , [0041] , [0044] * [I] 2,3,5-15;
 [A]DE10237920  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0018] * * claims 1,3,9,10 *;
 [I]DE10258766  (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [I] 1,14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0009] , [0013] , [0034] * * figure 1 *